This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2020 at 10:26:10 (UTC).

Curtis Wheeler et al v. County of Orange et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 Curtis Wheeler filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against County of Orange. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and Cormac J. Carney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01264

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Curtis Wheeler

Cynthia Wheeler

Defendants

Shane L. Sileby

County of Orange

Socorro Villegas

Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roger E Naghash

Attorney at Law Offices Of Roger E Naghash

19900 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 1100

Irvine, CA 92612-2440

Defendant Attorneys

Michael L Wroniak

Attorney at Collins Collins Muir and Stewart LLP

750 The City Drive Suite 400

Orange, CA 92868-4940

April Marie Mitchell

Attorney at Collins Collins Muir and Stewart LLP

750 The City Drive Suite 400

Orange, CA 92868

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Proposed Order

15 #1

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant County of Orange. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney April Marie Mitchell added to party County of Orange(pty:dft)) (Mitchell, April) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File response filed by Defendant County of Orange.(Attorney Michael L Wroniak added to party County of Orange(pty:dft))(Wroniak, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#13

(#13) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Shane L. Sileby(individually), Shane L. Sileby(in his official capacity as Director, County of Orange-Public Works). (twdb) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

#12

(#12) SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #5 filed by Plaintiffs Curtis Wheeler, Cynthia Wheeler. (Naghash, Roger) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#11

(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant County of Orange. (twdb) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#10

(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants Shane L. Sileby(individually), Shane L. Sileby(in his official capacity as Director, County of Orange-Public Works). (twdb) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

#9

(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants Socorro Villegas(individually ), Socorro Villegas(in her official capacity as Officer). (twdb) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

8 #2

Summons

8 #1

Summons

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Supplement #6 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet, 2 summons, 3 summons, 4 summons are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so.. (ghap) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #4

summons

1 #3

summons

1 #2

summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27220095 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Cynthia Wheeler, Curtis Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (Attorney Roger E Naghash added to party Curtis Wheeler(pty:pla), Attorney Roger E Naghash added to party Cynthia Wheeler(pty:pla))(Naghash, Roger) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant County of Orange. Motion set for hearing on 10/5/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney April Marie Mitchell added to party County of Orange(pty:dft)) (Mitchell, April) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File response filed by Defendant County of Orange.(Attorney Michael L Wroniak added to party County of Orange(pty:dft))(Wroniak, Michael) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Shane L. Sileby(individually), Shane L. Sileby(in his official capacity as Director, County of Orange-Public Works). (twdb) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #5 filed by Plaintiffs Curtis Wheeler, Cynthia Wheeler. (Naghash, Roger) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant County of Orange. (twdb) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants Shane L. Sileby(individually), Shane L. Sileby(in his official capacity as Director, County of Orange-Public Works). (twdb) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendants Socorro Villegas(individually ), Socorro Villegas(in her official capacity as Officer). (twdb) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Supplement #6 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #4 filed by Plaintiffs Curtis Wheeler, Cynthia Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Naghash, Roger) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Supplement #6 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (twdb) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUPPLEMENT to Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #5 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons, #4 filed by Plaintiffs Curtis Wheeler, Cynthia Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons)(Naghash, Roger) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments 1 Civil Cover Sheet, 2 summons, 3 summons, 4 summons are attached to the Complaint. Each of these documents should have been filed and entered separately under its correct event/relief. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so.. (ghap) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Please remove et al from the caption of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (ghap) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (ghap) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27220095 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Cynthia Wheeler, Curtis Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 summons, #3 summons, #4 summons) (Attorney Roger E Naghash added to party Curtis Wheeler(pty:pla), Attorney Roger E Naghash added to party Cynthia Wheeler(pty:pla))(Naghash, Roger) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roger E. Naghash