This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/05/2022 at 08:19:25 (UTC).

Curtis v. Walmart

Case Summary

On 01/04/2022 Curtis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Daphne A. Oberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00009

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daphne A. Oberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melonie Curtis

Defendant

Walmart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alan D. Tucker

Attorney at DRIGGS BILLS & DAY

737 E Winchester St

Salt Lake City, UT 84107

Colby B. Vogt

Attorney at DRIGGS BILLS & DAY

737 E Winchester St

Salt Lake City, UT 84107

Parker A. Allred

Attorney at DRIGGS BILLS & DAY

737 E Winchester St

Salt Lake City, UT 84107

Defendant Attorneys

Mitchel T. Rice

Attorney at MORGAN MINNOCK RICE & MINER

136 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Andrea M. Keysar

Attorney at MORGAN MINNOCK RICE & MINER

136 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

Riley J. Serafine

Attorney at MORGAN MINNOCK RICE & MINER

136 S Main Ste 800

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Exhibit B - Summons

15 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

15 #15

Main Document

#14

(#14) ORDER TO AMEND NOTICE OF REMOVAL re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Walmart. The amended notice must be filed within fourteen days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/26/22. (alf) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

#13

(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/28/2023. Motions due by 5/26/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2023 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. See order for other deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/25/22. (alf) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiff Melonie Curtis, Defendant Walmart. (alf) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #5 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) filed by Walmart. (Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/5/22. (alf) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Melonie Curtis, Defendant Walmart. Form due by 1/20/2022. (alf) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

4 #4

Accpetance of Service Return of Electronic Notification

4 #2

Complaint Return of Electronic Notification

2 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

2 #2

Exhibit B - Summons

2 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 210906636, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4209809) filed by Walmart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 210906636, against Walmart. filed by Walmart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons) (Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER TO AMEND NOTICE OF REMOVAL re #2 Notice of Removal, filed by Walmart. The amended notice must be filed within fourteen days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/26/22. (alf) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 4/28/2023. Motions due by 5/26/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 6/5/2023 at 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. See order for other deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/25/22. (alf) (Entered: 01/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT OF ATTORNEY PLANNING MEETING. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) by Plaintiff Melonie Curtis, Defendant Walmart. (alf) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • Docket(#10) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Melonie Curtis. (alf) (Entered: 01/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE REMINDER - All parties are requested to respond within the time frame set forth in the #5 Notice of Presiding Magistrate Assignment, pursuant to General Order 07-001. If you have already consented/objected, please disregard this notice. No judge will be informed of a party's response unless all parties have consented to the assignment of the matter to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Unless consents from all parties are received within fifteen(15) days, the case will be randomly re-assigned to a U.S. District Judge without further notice.# Link to Magistrate Consent Objection form (alf) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • Docket(#8) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendant Walmart. (alf) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal #2 ) filed by Walmart. (Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within fourteen(14) days. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 1/5/22. (alf) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Melonie Curtis, Defendant Walmart. Form due by 1/20/2022. (alf) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) File downloaded from Third District Court, Salt Lake County Web Xchange consisting of Docket Sheet, Complaint, Acceptance of Service, Notice of Removal and all applicable state court returns. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Complaint Return of Electronic Notification, #3 Acceptance of Service, #4 Accpetance of Service Return of Electronic Notification, #5 Notice of Removal, #6 Notice of Removal Return of Electronic Notification) (alf) (Entered: 01/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ADR, e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Melonie Curtis, Defendant Walmart. (nmt) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 3rd District Court Salt Lake County, case number 210906636, (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4209809) filed by Walmart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Rice, Mitchel) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Defendant Walmart is directed to E-File the Notice of Removal and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. (nmt) (Entered: 01/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mitchel T. Rice

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrea M. Keysar