This case was last updated from PACER on 04/12/2019 at 07:29:54 (UTC).

Curtis v. Nessel et al

Case Summary

On 02/11/2019 Curtis filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Nessel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00112

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew T. Curtis

South Bend, IN 46637

Defendants

Matthew Whitaker

United States of America

Dana Nessel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Jeanne Frances Long

Attorney at U.S. Attorney (Grand Rapids)

The Law Bldg., 330 Ionia Ave., Nw, P.O. Box 208

Grand Rapids, MI 49501-0208

James Patrick Kennedy

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General (Alcohol-Lansing)

P.O. Box 30736

Lansing, MI 48909

Mark Gordon Sands

Attorney at MI Dept Attorney General

G. Mennen Williams Bldg., 525 W Ottawa St., P.O. Box 30736

Lansing, MI 48909

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss and Proof of Mailing #14 filed by Matthew T. Curtis (Curtis, Matthew) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #8 motion for leave to file and receive notice electronically; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

#14

(#14) MOTION to dismiss and Proof of Mailing by defendant Dana Nessel; (Kennedy, James) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Michigan Attorney General's Limited Appearance and Proof of Mailing by defendant Dana Nessel (Sands, Mark) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#12

(#12) PROOF OF MAILING by defendant Dana Nessel re Notice (Other) #11 Michigan Attorney General's Limited Appearance (Kennedy, James) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re United States of America (named as "The United States of America") and Matthew Whitaker (Acting Attorney General of the United States, in his official capacity) filed by plaintiff Matthew T. Curtis (ems) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (ems). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

#8

(#16) ORDER granting #8 motion for leave to file and receive notice electronically; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

7 #3

Attachment 3

7 #1

Attachment 1

6 #1

Attachment 1

#6

No Description Available

#5

Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #5 , Order on Motion for TRO #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Matthew T. Curtis (mg) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#4

Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #5 , Order on Motion for TRO #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Matthew T. Curtis (mg) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

#3

Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Matthew Curtis (mg) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

#2

(#4) ORDER denying #2 motion for TRO; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief against Dana Nessel, United States of America, Matthew Whitaker filed by Matthew T. Curtis (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RESPONSE in opposition to MOTION to dismiss and Proof of Mailing #14 filed by Matthew T. Curtis (Curtis, Matthew) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRO SE PLAINTIFF REGISTERED TO E-FILE; Copy of Motion for Leave to File and Receive Service Electronically (Pro Se) #8 complete with login and password sent via U.S. Mail to Matthew T. Curtis per order #16 (jlb) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order on Motion for Leave to File and Receive Notice Electronically #16 sent via U.S. Mail to Matthew T. Curtis (mg) (Entered: 04/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER granting #8 motion for leave to file and receive notice electronically; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw) (Entered: 04/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) BRIEF in support of MOTION to dismiss and Proof of Mailing #14 , Certificate of Compliance and Proof of Mailing filed by Dana Nessel (Kennedy, James) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to dismiss and Proof of Mailing by defendant Dana Nessel; (Kennedy, James) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Michigan Attorney General's Limited Appearance and Proof of Mailing by defendant Dana Nessel (Sands, Mark) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROOF OF MAILING by defendant Dana Nessel re Notice (Other) #11 Michigan Attorney General's Limited Appearance (Kennedy, James) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Michigan Attorney General's Limited Appearance by defendant Dana Nessel (Kennedy, James) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re United States of America (named as "The United States of America") and Matthew Whitaker (Acting Attorney General of the United States, in his official capacity) filed by plaintiff Matthew T. Curtis (ems) Modified text on 3/25/2019 (ems). (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge, #5 , Order on Motion for TRO #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Matthew T. Curtis (mg) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green for handling of all matters under 636(a) and 636(b)(1)(A) and for submission of recommendations on dispositive motions under 636(b)(1)(B); signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, acr) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • (NON-DOCUMENT) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Jeanne Frances Long on behalf of defendants United States of America, Matthew Whitaker (Long, Jeanne) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER denying #2 motion for TRO; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Matthew Curtis (mg) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of receipt of case (mg) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Dana Nessel, United States of America, Matthew Whitaker, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General and handed back to plaintiff at counter (mg) Modified text on 2/11/2019 (mg). (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • RECEIPT: in the amount of $400, receipt number KZ003723; for Filing Fee (mg) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for temporary restraining order by plaintiff Matthew T. Curtis; (mg) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT for declaratory and injunctive relief against Dana Nessel, United States of America, Matthew Whitaker filed by Matthew T. Curtis (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less