This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/15/2020 at 08:33:35 (UTC).

Curtis v. Fairview Health Services et al

Case Summary

On 03/16/2020 Curtis filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Fairview Health Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Tony N. Leung and Susan Richard Nelson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-00739

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Tony N. Leung

Presiding Judge

Susan Richard Nelson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Curtis

Cristina Curtis

Defendants

Fairview Health Services

Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Denise Yegge Tataryn

Attorney at Nolan, Thompson, Leighton & Tataryn, PLC

5001 American Blvd. West, Suite 595

Bloomington, MN 55437

Robert J Leighton, Jr

Attorney at Nolan, Thompson, Leighton & Tataryn, PLC

5001 American Blvd W, Suite 595

Bloomington, MN 55437

Defendant Attorneys

Barbara P Berens

Attorney at Berens & Miller, PA

80 S 8Th St Ste 3720

Mpls, MN 55402

Samuel M. Schwartz-Fenwick

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606-6448

Matthew Aaron Clabots

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

Carrie L Zochert

Attorney at Berens & Miller, P.A.

3720 Ids Center, 80 South 8Th Street

Mpls, MN 55402

Erin K Fogarty Lisle

Attorney at Berens & Miller, PA

80 S 8Th St Ste 3720

Mpls, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

22 #1

Civil Notice - appeal

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#13

#7

#6

5 #1

Affidavit of Service

#5

4 #1

Affidavit of Service

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) JUDGMENT (Attachments: #1 Civil Notice - appeal)(MMP) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER on #18 Stipulation. Plaintiff's claim for short-term disability benefits in the above-entitled action against Prudential Insurance Company of America is dismissed with prejudice, without liability for any damages and without an award of attorney's fees and/or costs to any party. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/11/2020.(SMD) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER DISMISSING Fairview Health Services, pursuant to #16 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 5/11/2020.(SMD) (Entered: 05/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #18 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Tataryn, Denise) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Prudential by Cristina Curtis. (Tataryn, Denise) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #16 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Tataryn, Denise) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION of Dismissal as to Fairview Health Services by Cristina Curtis. (Tataryn, Denise) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Samuel M. Schwartz-Fenwick for Fairview Health Services and for Prudential Insurance Company of America; granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Matthew Aaron Clabots for Fairview Health Services and for Prudential Insurance Company of America. Approved by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/30/2020. (NAH) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF AND ORDER FOR PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2020 at 11:00 AM in Judge's Chambers 9W (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(HAM) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Matthew Clabots. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-7682864 filed by Fairview Health Services, Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Berens, Barbara) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendants Fairview Health Services, Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Berens, Barbara) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint Defendants' Answer and Affirmative and Additional Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Fairview Health Services, Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Berens, Barbara) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER on #6 Stipulation. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung on 4/7/2020. (JRE) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #6 Stipulation,. (Berens, Barbara) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Joint Stipulation for Extension of Time For Defendants to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Fairview Health Services, Prudential Insurance Company of America. Jointly Signed by Cristina Curtis. (Berens, Barbara) (Entered: 04/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cristina Curtis. Prudential Insurance Company of America served on 3/18/2020, answer due 4/8/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Tataryn, Denise) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cristina Curtis. Fairview Health Services served on 3/23/2020, answer due 4/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Tataryn, Denise) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Fairview Health Services, Prudential Insurance Company of America. (MMG) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Susan Richard Nelson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Tony N. Leung. Please use case number 20-cv-739 SRN/TNL. (MMG) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-7567271) filed by Cristina Curtis. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Tataryn, Denise) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fairview Health Services is a litigant

Latest cases where Curtis is a litigant

Latest cases where The Prudential Insurance Company of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Denise Yegge Tataryn