This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/19/2021 at 13:09:54 (UTC).

Curry et al v. Family Security Insurance Co

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Curry filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Family Security Insurance Co. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are James D Cain, Jr and Kathleen Kay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01045

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James D Cain, Jr

Referral Judge

Kathleen Kay

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael Curry

Kassie Coltrin

Defendants

Family Security Insurance Co

United Property & Casualty Insurance Co

Special Masters

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Sulphur, LA 70663

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Craig Jones

Attorney at Jones & Hill

131 Hwy 165 S

Oakdale, LA 71463

Craig Ray Hill

Attorney at Jones & Hill (OB)

P O Box 1260

Oberlin, LA 70655

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher K Jones

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Jennifer Rae Dietz

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (BR)

701 Main St

Baton Rouge, LA 70062

Richard William Wolff

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Sydnee Doolittle Menou

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Cole Cisco Frazier

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

John Powers Wolff, III

Attorney at Keogh Cox & Wilson (PO BOX)

P O Box 1151

Baton Rouge, LA 70821

Special Master Attorneys

Patrick A Juneau, Jr

Attorney at Juneau David

P O Drawer 51268

Lafayette, LA 70505-1268

Cade Richard Cole

Attorney at Law Office of Cade R Cole

1523 Cypress St

Sulphur, LA 70663

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Family Security Insurance Co.(aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, United Property & Casualty Insurance Co answer due 6/11/2021. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 6/4/2021. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#6

(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Family Security Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent United Insurance Holdings Corp for Family Security Insurance Co. (aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

5 #1

Proposed order

#5

(#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Christopher K Jones added to party Family Security Insurance Co (pty:dft))(aty,Jones, Christopher) Modified to add filer on 6/2/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Curry, Kassie Coltrin. Family Security Insurance Co served 4/20/2021, answer due 5/21/21. (aty,Jones, John) Modified to edit docket text on 5/7/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Family Security Insurance Co. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

2 #2

Exhibit B

2 #1

Exhibit A

#2

(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Family Security Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4646721) filed by Michael Curry, Kassie Coltrin. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John Craig Jones added to party Kassie Coltrin(pty:pla), Attorney John Craig Jones added to party Michael Curry(pty:pla))(aty,Jones, John) Modified on 4/21/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Family Security Insurance Co.(aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint, United Property & Casualty Insurance Co answer due 6/11/2021. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 6/4/2021. (crt,Benoit, T) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Family Security Insurance Co identifying Corporate Parent United Insurance Holdings Corp for Family Security Insurance Co. (aty,Jones, Christopher) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, with consent by United Property & Casualty Insurance Co. Motion Ripe Deadline set for 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(Attorney Christopher K Jones added to party Family Security Insurance Co (pty:dft))(aty,Jones, Christopher) Modified to add filer on 6/2/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Curry, Kassie Coltrin. Family Security Insurance Co served 4/20/2021, answer due 5/21/21. (aty,Jones, John) Modified to edit docket text on 5/7/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Family Security Insurance Co. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. 1. Signed by Judge James D Cain, Jr on 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge James D Cain, Jr and Magistrate Judge Kathleen Kay. (crt,Thomas, T) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Family Security Insurance Co (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4646721) filed by Michael Curry, Kassie Coltrin. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney John Craig Jones added to party Kassie Coltrin(pty:pla), Attorney John Craig Jones added to party Michael Curry(pty:pla))(aty,Jones, John) Modified on 4/21/2021 (Thomas, T). (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FAMILY SECURITY INSURANCE COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where United Property & Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cade Richard Cole

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick A Juneau, Jr