This case was last updated from PACER on 12/08/2019 at 08:34:28 (UTC).

Currie v. The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 10/09/2019 Currie filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against The Prudential Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Frank D. Whitney and David Keesler. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00517

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Frank D. Whitney

Referral Judge

David Keesler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lenox John Currie

Defendant

The Prudential Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert A. Whitlow

Attorney at Sellers, Ayers, Dortch & Lyons, P.A.

301 South Mcdowell Street, Suite 410

Charlotte, NC 28204

Defendant Attorneys

Tara M. Ellis

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw, LLP

620 8Th Avenue, 32Nd Floor

Ny, NY 10018

Amanda A. Sonneborn

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 S. Wacker Dr. Ste 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

Ethan Coretz Goemann

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

121 W. Trade Street, Suite 2020

Charlotte, NC 28202

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Amanda A. Sonneborn is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/21/19. (mga) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Tara M. Ellis is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/21/19. (mga) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Amanda A. Sonneborn Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4269260. by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Goemann, Ethan). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tara Ellis Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4269250. by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Goemann, Ethan). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 11/20/2019)

#7

(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Goemann, Ethan) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#6

(#6) DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Goemann, Ethan) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/7/19. (mga) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goemann, Ethan). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Coretz Goemann on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Goemann, Ethan) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (mek) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4215130), filed by Lenox John Currie.(Whitlow, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • Notice to Amanda A. Sonneborn: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for ECF at #www.ncwd.uscourts.gov. Deadline by 12/2/2019. (mga) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Amanda A. Sonneborn is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant, The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/21/19. (mga) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Tara M. Ellis is hereby admitted pro hac vice to represent Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/21/19. (mga) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Amanda A. Sonneborn Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4269260. by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Goemann, Ethan). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Tara Ellis Filing fee $ 281, receipt number 0419-4269250. by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Goemann, Ethan). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Goemann, Ethan) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America.(Goemann, Ethan) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendant The Prudential Insurance Company of America shall file a response to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before November 22, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/7/19. (mga) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: #1 Complaint by The Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Goemann, Ethan). Motions referred to David Keesler. (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Ethan Coretz Goemann on behalf of The Prudential Insurance Company of America (Goemann, Ethan) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued Electronically as to The Prudential Insurance Company of America. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (mek) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Clerk's Entry and Service of #Initial Scheduling Order and #Certificate of Initial Attorney FRCP 26(f) Conference Form pursuant to the Standing Order Governing Civil Case Management before the Honorable Frank D. Whitney (3:07-mc-47 (Doc. No. 2)). The parties are directed to click on the link above to retrieve the Order. (mek) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • Case assigned to Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney and Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the #Case Assignment Packet. This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document.(mek) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against The Prudential Insurance Company of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0419-4215130), filed by Lenox John Currie.(Whitlow, Robert) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.