This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2021 at 09:52:18 (UTC).

Curran v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Curran filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Lincoln D. Almond and William E. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00105

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lincoln D. Almond

Presiding Judge

William E. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Virginia Curran

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Secant Medical, Inc.

Secant Medical, LLC

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Quirk

Attorney at Williams Cuker Berezofsky, LLC

1515 Market Street, Suite 1300

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Esther Berezofsky

Attorney at Motley Rice, LLC

210 Lake Drive East, Suite 101

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002

Defendant Attorneys

Julie A. Callsen

Attorney at Tucker Ellis, LLC

950 Main Ave Suite 1100

Cleveland, OH 44113

Melissa A. Merk

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH

Suite 2000, One Logan Square

Philadelphia, PA 19103-6996

Molly Elizabeth Flynn

Attorney at Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

One Logan Square, 18Th & Cherry Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

27 #1

*Restricted*

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#21

#22

#20

5 #5

Exhibit

5 #4

Exhibit C

4 #3

Text of Proposed Order

4 #2

Exhibit A-Unpublished Court Opinion

4 #1

Memorandum of Law

#4

#3

#2

#1

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-05755. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Case transferred in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:19-cv-05755. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Pursuant to LR Gen 201(b)(5), counsel who is a member in good standing of the bar of another federal district court is exempt from the requirements of bar membership, and may appear and practice in this Court for this case. Counsel is directed to register as an ECF Filing User in accordance with LR Gen 304(a) by completing the ECF Registration Form located under the CM/ECF Quick Link from our website. #http://www.rid.uscourts.gov (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Copy of Order/Notice dated 3/16/20 (Document # 23 & 24) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to SECANT MEDICAL for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD. (rf, ) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Copy of Order dated 3/6/20 (Document # 21) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to SECANT MEDICAL, LLC for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD. (lvj, ) (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER THAT CURRAN'S MOTION TO REMAND IS DENIED. DEFTS' MOTION TO DISMISS OR TRANSFER VENUE IS GRANTED AS TO THE REQUEST TO TRANSFER VENUE & DENIED AS MOOT IN ALL OTHER RESPECTS. THE CASE IS TRANSFERRED UNDER 28 U.S.C. SEC. 1404(a) TO THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE DISTRICT OF RHODE ISLAND; & THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE THE U.S.D.C. FOR THE DISTRICT OF RHODE ISLAND WITH THE COMPLETE CASEFILE & MARK THIS CASE CLOSED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/16/20. 3/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES.(kw, ) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/16/20. 3/16/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES.(kw, ) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER THAT DEFTS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY (ECF NO. 20) IS GRANTED & EXHIBIT A TO THE MOTION IS DEEMED FILED AS OF 3/5/2020. SIGNED BY HONORABLE GERALD J. PAPPERT ON 3/6/20.3/9/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED AND MAILED TO UNREP PARTIES.(kw, ) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Supplemental Authority, filed by DEFTS ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (kw, ) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Memorandum, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(CALLSEN, JULIE) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • DocketCopy of Order/Notice dated 2/4/20 (Document #17) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to Secant Medical, Inc. for the following reason: Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as Addressed. Unable to Forward. (kw, ) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Memorandum of Law in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by VIRGINIA CURRAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-state court motion, #2 Exhibit B-state court opposition, #3 Exhibit C-state court order, #4 Exhibit D-unpublished state court opinion, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(QUIRK, MICHAEL) Modified on 12/31/2019 (tjd). (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.. (sg, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Remand filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Authority)(CALLSEN, JULIE) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re #4 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A. - Order, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Order, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Plaintiff Response Document, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Order)(CALLSEN, JULIE) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#6) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (nd, ) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or, in the Alternative, to Transfer Venue filed by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Memorandum. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit)(CALLSEN, JULIE) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by VIRGINIA CURRAN.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit A-Unpublished Court Opinion, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(QUIRK, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL J. QUIRK on behalf of VIRGINIA CURRAN with Certificate of Service(QUIRK, MICHAEL) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent JOHNSON & JOHNSON for ETHICON, INC.. with CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ETHICON, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 191000667. CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207911)(bw, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Secant Medical, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL J. QUIRK