Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 05:05:17 (UTC).

Curran v. Axon Enterprise, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/13/2019 Curran filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Axon Enterprise, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas E. Miller and Henry C. Morgan, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00617

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Miller

Presiding Judge

Henry C. Morgan, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn Curran

Defendants

Taser

Taser International, Inc.

Richard Nelson

Axon Enterprise, Inc.

Taser International

Axon Enterprise, Inc. doing business as Taser International

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elliott Matthew Buckner

Attorney at Breit Cantor Grana Buckner

7130 Glen Forest Dr, Suite 400

Richmond, VA 23226

Michael Scott Bucci

Attorney at Cantor Stoneburner Ford Grana & Buckner

7130 Glen Forest Dr, Suite 400

Richmond, VA 23226

Kevin Biniazan

Attorney at Breit Cantor Grana Buckner, PLLC

600 22Nd St, Suite 402

Virginia Beach, VA 23451

Jeffrey Neil Stedman

Attorney at Breit Cantor Grana Buckner

7130 Glen Forest Dr, Suite 400

Richmond, VA 23226

Defendant Attorneys

Renee Anne Danega

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP (DC)

1717 Pennsylvania Ave Nw, Suite 500

Washington, DC 20006

Amy Lynn Nguyen

Attorney at Axon Enterprises, Inc.

17800 N. 85Th Street

Scottsdale, AZ 85255

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) Reply in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Axon Enterprise, Inc. (Danega, Renee) Modified text on 1/9/20 (bpet, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

#14

(#14) RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 1/2/20. (lbax, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

13 #1

Proposed Order

#13

(#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Danega, Renee) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#12

(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Shawn Curran. (Stedman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Neil Stedman on behalf of Shawn Curran (Stedman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Axon's #8 12/6/19 responsive filing is deemed timely. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 12/11/19. (bpet, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for Amy Lynn Nguyen as to Axon Enterprise, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 12/09/2019. (bboy, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

8 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support by Axon Enterprise, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Danega, Renee) Modified text on 12/6/19. (bpet, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Lynn Nguyen and Certification of Local Counsel Renee A. Danega by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. (Danega, Renee) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Lynn Nguyen and Certification of Local Counsel Renee A. Danega Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6951131. by Axon Enterprise, Inc. (Danega, Renee) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Reply to Motion re #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Shawn Curran. (Bucci, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

4 #1

Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Danega, Renee) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. (Danega, Renee) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 to removal

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketRule 16(b) Scheduling Conference reset for 1/28/2020 at 09:00 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. (lbax, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Reply in Support re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Axon Enterprise, Inc. (Danega, Renee) Modified text on 1/9/20 (bpet, ) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RULE 26(f) PRETRIAL ORDER: Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2020 at 11:00 AM in Norfolk - Clerk's Office Conference Room, 1st Floor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask on 1/2/20. (lbax, ) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply In Support of Motion to Dismiss by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Danega, Renee) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Shawn Curran. (Stedman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Neil Stedman on behalf of Shawn Curran (Stedman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. Axon's #8 12/6/19 responsive filing is deemed timely. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr., on 12/11/19. (bpet, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice for Amy Lynn Nguyen as to Axon Enterprise, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr on 12/09/2019. (bboy, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Memorandum in Support by Axon Enterprise, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Danega, Renee) Modified text on 12/6/19. (bpet, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Amended Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Lynn Nguyen and Certification of Local Counsel Renee A. Danega by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. (Danega, Renee) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Lynn Nguyen and Certification of Local Counsel Renee A. Danega. Foreign counsel may not electronically sign documents; the filing user has been advised to refile the motion. (bpet, ) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Amy Lynn Nguyen and Certification of Local Counsel Renee A. Danega Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6951131. by Axon Enterprise, Inc. (Danega, Renee) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Reply to Motion re #4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Shawn Curran. (Bucci, Michael) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Danega, Renee) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. (Danega, Renee) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Correction re #1 Notice of Removal. Document number 1 was the party's first appearance which should have been accompanied by a financial disclosure as required by Local Rule 7.1. The party is allowed seven (7) days to correct the deficiency and file the financial disclosure statement. Failure to file the financial disclosure statement within this period of time will subject #1 to being stricken from the record. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Henry C. Morgan, Jr and Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (epri, ) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6935082.), filed by Axon Enterprise, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 to removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Danega, Renee) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TASER INTERNATIONAL INC. is a litigant