This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/23/2022 at 09:21:06 (UTC).

Curlee v. The Hartford et al

Case Summary

On 05/24/2022 Curlee filed an Other lawsuit against The Hartford. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are William L. Campbell, Jr and Jeffery S. Frensley. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00379

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William L. Campbell, Jr

Referral Judge

Jeffery S. Frensley

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aubrey L. Curlee

Defendant

Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Kennerly Burger

Defendant Attorney

Nikole M. Crow

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Attachment - Timeline

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#3

(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/21/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/25/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

6 #6

Main Document

6 #1

Attachment Summons for Defendant The Hartford

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Attachment Summons for Defendant Americold Logistics, LLC

#8

(#8) Summons issued as to Americold Logistics, LLC, and The Hartford. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS returned executed by the Department of Commerce and Insurance on behalf of Aubrey L. Curlee, against the Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company who was served on 6/3/2022. (mg) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: In light of the Order extending the deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (Docket No. #10 ), the Initial Case Management Conference currently scheduled for July 21, 2022 at 9:00 a.m. is continued and reset for August 11, 2022 at 10:00 a.m. The Parties shall call 1-877-336-1831 at the appointed time, and when prompted for the access code, enter 7039387# to participate in the Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 7/14/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(ln) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting #9 Motion to Dismiss Party; and granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer due 7/25/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley on 6/28/2022. (mg) Modified on 6/28/2022 (mg). (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint Party Name, Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Defendant, Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by The Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Attachment (Consent Order))(Crow, Nikole) (Entered: 06/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS returned executed by the Department of Commerce and Insurance on behalf of Aubrey L. Curlee, against the Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company who was served on 6/3/2022. (mg) (Entered: 07/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons issued as to Americold Logistics, LLC, and The Hartford. Service copies will be returned to counsel by mail. (mg) (Entered: 05/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Defendant Americold Logistics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons for Defendant Americold Logistics, LLC)(Burger, William) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Defendant The Hartford. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Summons for Defendant The Hartford)(Burger, William) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by District Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 5/25/2022. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.)(mg) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO FILER re DE#1 : This document has been scanned. Documents generated from a word processor (Word or WordPerfect) should NOT be scanned, but rather printed directly to PDF via a PDF writer. Document must be text searchable. You do not have to refile this document, however, future scanned pleadings of this nature may require refiling. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketTN State Bar status verified as active for William Kennerly Burger admitted to this court. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 7/21/2022 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jeffery S. Frensley. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Americold Logistics, LLC, and The Hartford (Filing fee $402, Receipt number ATNMDC-3600276), filed by Aubrey L. Curlee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment - Timeline)(mg) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less