This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/09/2021 at 08:17:32 (UTC).

Curcio et al v. Demopoulos et al

Case Summary

On 11/10/2020 Curcio filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Demopoulos. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Peggy Kuo and Roslynn R. Mauskopf. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-05463

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Peggy Kuo

Presiding Judge

Roslynn R. Mauskopf

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

John Curcio

Kenneth Barrett

William Cassese

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Stephen Malone

Michael Spinelli

Demos P. Demopoulos

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey D. Pollack

Attorney at Mintz & Gold, LLP

600 Third Avenue 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Gabriel Altman

Attorney at Mintz and Gold LLP

600 Third Avenue, Ste 25Th Floor

New York, NY 10016

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Erin Veronica McGee

Attorney at Friedman and Anspach

1500 Broadway, Suite 2300

New York, NY 10036

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

9 #1

Affidavit of Service for Defendant Michael Spinelli

#9

#5

#4

#3

2 #2

Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Order to Show Cause

2 #1

Declaration Declaration of John Curcio in Support of Order to Show Cause

#2

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by William Cassese. (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 01/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketOrder. A telephonic status conference is scheduled for January 11, 2021 at 2:00pm. The parties are directed to call toll free (877) 336-1274 and input the access code 1453850 at the time of the conference. No additional security code is needed. Once all parties are on the line, the call will be connected. (The parties are reminded that, pursuant to Local Civil Rule 1.8, they may not independently record any court proceedings. A transcript of the proceedings may be ordered from the Clerk's Office.)The parties are directed to be prepared to discuss whether they jointly request the appointment of a special master and, if so, the proposed scope of that person's duties. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 1/4/2021. (Rand, Matthew) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Answer and Counterclaim and Courtesy Copy of Summons and Complaint served on William Cassese on December 15, 2020, filed by Demos P. Demopoulos, Demos P. Demopoulos, Stephen Malone, Stephen Malone, Michael Spinelli, Michael Spinelli. (McGee, Erin) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STATUS REPORT Regarding Local 854 Funds by Kenneth Barrett, John Curcio (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #12 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by Defendants/Counterclaim Plaintiffs by Kenneth Barrett, John Curcio. (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Kenneth Barrett, John Curcio, John Curcio, Kenneth Barrett, William Cassese by Demos P. Demopoulos, Stephen Malone, Michael Spinelli, Demos P. Demopoulos, Michael Spinelli, Stephen Malone. (McGee, Erin) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATUS REPORT by Demos P. Demopoulos, Stephen Malone, Michael Spinelli (McGee, Erin) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Letter Informing Court of Recent Developments in Mar-Can Litigation by Kenneth Barrett, John Curcio (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by John Curcio, Kenneth Barrett. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service for Defendant Michael Spinelli, #2 Affidavit of Service for Defendant Stephen Malone) (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter Seeking Appointment of Special Master by Kenneth Barrett, John Curcio (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 11/12/2020. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Chief Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Gabriel Altman on behalf of Kenneth Barrett, John Curcio (aty to be noticed) (Altman, Gabriel) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Kenneth Barrett, John Curcio (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketNotice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. All questions *** INCLUDING the CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY*** section on the second page needs to be answered. Please resubmit corrected Civil Cover Sheet. This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Unsigned Order to Show Cause Seeking Emergency Relief by Kenneth Barrett, John Curcio (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of John Curcio in Support of Order to Show Cause, #2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law in Support of Order to Show Cause) (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Employer Trustees against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number BNYEDC-13664318 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by John Curcio, Kenneth Barrett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Pollack, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gabriel Altman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Dean Pollack