This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/19/2021 at 08:31:59 (UTC).

Curava Corporation v. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Curava Corporation filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul G. Gardephe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01457

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Gardephe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Curava Corporation

Defendants

Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc.

MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.

Savino Del Bene (Shanghai) Co. Ltd

Savino Del Bene SPA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William M. Fennell

Attorney at Nicoletti Hornig & Sweeney

88 Pine Street, 7Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Daniel W Raab

Attorney at Law Offices Daniel W. Raab, P.A.

9555 North Kendall Drive

Miami, FL 33176

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew Robert Spector

Attorney at Spector Rubin, P.A.

3250 Mary Street, Ste. 405

Miami, FL 33133

Mark A. Beckman

Attorney at Gordon & Rees , LLP

1 Battery Plaza,28Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Andrew R. Spector, Esq. dated April 7, 2021.. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/9/2021) Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc. answer due 4/27/2021 (ks) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#15

(#15) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Andrew R. Spector, Esq. dated April 7, 2021. Document filed by Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc...(Spector, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

#14

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#13

(#13) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#12

(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Beckman on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc. served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. Service was accepted by Derrick Davis, Legal Support Associate. Document filed by Curava Corporation..(Fennell, William) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Service was accepted by Allison Rocco, Managing Agent. Document filed by Curava Corporation..(Fennell, William) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 MOTION for Daniel Warren Raab to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/24/2021) (jca) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Savino Del Bene (Shanghai) Co. Ltd, Savino Del Bene SPA, Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc...(pc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Savino Del Bene SPA, Savino Del Bene (Shanghai) Co. Ltd, and Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Curava Corporation..(Fennell, William) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#3

(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Curava Corporation..(Fennell, William) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fennell, William) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit #2 (Savino Freight Bill)

1 #1

Exhibit #1 (MSC Sea Waybill)

#1

(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Andrew R. Spector, Esq. dated April 7, 2021.. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 4/9/2021) Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc. answer due 4/27/2021 (ks) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint, (Unopposed) addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Andrew R. Spector, Esq. dated April 7, 2021. Document filed by Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc...(Spector, Andrew) (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark A. Beckman on behalf of MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A...(Beckman, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc. served on 3/16/2021, answer due 4/6/2021. Service was accepted by Derrick Davis, Legal Support Associate. Document filed by Curava Corporation..(Fennell, William) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. Service was accepted by Allison Rocco, Managing Agent. Document filed by Curava Corporation..(Fennell, William) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #8 MOTION for Daniel Warren Raab to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/24/2021) (jca) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Daniel Warren Raab to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Daniel Warren Raab to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Curava Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration In Support, #2 Exhibit Supreme Court of Florida Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Raab, Daniel) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Daniel W. Raab to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-24050694. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Curava Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration In Support, #2 Exhibit Ceritificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed ORder).(Raab, Daniel) Modified on 2/23/2021 (wb). (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Per the SDNY COVID-19 COURTHOUSE ENTRY PROGRAM, anyone who appears at any SDNY courthouse must complete a questionnaire and have their temperature taken. Please see the instructions, attached below. Completing the questionnaire ahead of time will save time and effort upon entry. Only those individuals who meet the entry requirements established by the questionnaire will be permitted entry. Please contact chambers if you do not meet the requirements. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 5/20/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 2/22/2021) (jca) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Savino Del Bene (Shanghai) Co. Ltd, Savino Del Bene SPA, Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc...(pc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Savino Del Bene SPA, Savino Del Bene (Shanghai) Co. Ltd, and Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Curava Corporation..(Fennell, William) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Curava Corporation..(Fennell, William) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Fennell, William) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A., Savino Del Bene (Shanghai) Co. Ltd, Savino Del Bene SPA, Savino Del Bene U.S.A. Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-23991687)Document filed by Curava Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit #1 (MSC Sea Waybill), #2 Exhibit #2 (Savino Freight Bill)).(Fennell, William) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Savino Del Bene U.S.A., Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MSC Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Warren Raab

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William M. Fennell