This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/26/2021 at 10:16:08 (UTC).

Matthew Cuozzo v. Amazon Retail LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2021 Matthew Cuozzo filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Amazon Retail LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Autumn D. Spaeth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01271

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew Cuozzo

Defendants

Amazon Retail LLC

Does 1 through 50, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Larry W Lee

Attorney at Diversity Law Group PC

515 South Figueroa Street Suite 1250

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Max William Gavron

Attorney at Diversity Law Group APC

515 South Figueroa Street Suite 1250

Los Angeles, CA 90071

William Lucas Marder

Attorney at Polaris Law Group LLP

501 San Benito Street Suite 200

Hollister, CA 95023

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica M Pearigen

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

3161 Michelson Drive Suite 1200

Irvine, CA 92612

Katie Marie Magallanes

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612-4412

Melanie Rose Sava

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Lauren M. Blas

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

 

Court Documents

#18

17 #1

Proposed Order

17 #17

Main Document

#16

15 #3

Proposed Order

15 #2

Exhibit B

15 #1

Exhibit A

15 #15

Main Document

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Declaration of Lauren M. Blas in Support of Amazon Retail LLC's Motion to D

14 #14

Main Document

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO AMEND MOTION TO DISMISS OR STAY AND TO CONTINUEHEARING DATE AND RELATED CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES #17 by Judge Cormac J. Carney: The GRANTS the Stipulation, DEEMS Defendants prior Motion toDismiss Plaintiffs Complaint, or in the Alternative, Stay Action WITHDRAWN #14 , and orders the following briefing schedule for Defendant Amazon Retail LLC's Amended Motion and case management deadlines: Defendant to file and serve its Amended Motion on or before October 1, 2021; Plaintiff to file and serve any Opposition papers on or before October 15, 2021; Defendant to file and serve any Reply papers on or before October 25, 2021; Hearing to take place on Monday, November 8, 2021 at 1:30 P.M.; Parties to meet and confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) and Local Rule 26-1 on or before November 18, 2021; Parties to file a report of said conference pursuant to Rule 26(f) and Local Rule 26-1 on or before December 2, 2021; and The Court to issue a Scheduling Order on December 9, 2021. (lc) (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) STIPULATION to File Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, Stay Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #14 filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE OF INTENT by Judge Cormac J. Carney. Scheduling order to be issued on November 18, 2021. (kdu) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, Stay Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #14 filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order)(Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, Stay Action; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. Motion set for hearing on 10/18/2021 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lauren M. Blas in Support of Amazon Retail LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint or, in the Alternative, Stay Action, #2 Proposed Order) (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Amazon Retail LLC answer now due 9/3/2021, filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC.(Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Percy Anderson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:21-cv-05174 PA(MAAx) (rn) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Amazon Retail LLC. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-05174-PA (MAAx) (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC, re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #7 , Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form #9 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #8 served on July 30, 2021. (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (jtil) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal of Class Action with the Superior Court filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Matthew Cuozzo in Orange County Superior Court on 6/16/2021, attached as Exhibit B. (jtil) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to filed by defendant Amazon Retail LLC.(Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. Related Case(s): 2:21-cv-05174-PA (MAAx) (C.D. Cal.) (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC identifying Amazon.com, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. (Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2021-01206226-CU-OE-CXC Receipt No: ACACDC-31707592 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Amazon Retail LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Veronica Strickland, #2 Declaration of Lauren M. Blas, #3 Exhibit A - Docket, #4 Exhibit B - Complaint, #5 Exhibit C - Summons, #6 Exhibit D - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #7 Exhibit E - Receipt, #8 Exhibit F - Proof of Service of Summons, #9 Exhibit G - Zane Brown Decl., #10 Proof of Service) (Attorney Lauren M. Blas added to party Amazon Retail LLC(pty:dft))(Blas, Lauren) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Amazon Retail, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katie Marie Magallanes

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren Margaret Blas