This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:32:05 (UTC).

Cunningham v. National Warranty Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Cunningham filed an Other lawsuit against National Warranty Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine A. Nowak and Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00895

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christine A. Nowak

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Craig Cunningham

Plano, TX 75075

Defendants

David Cunningham

National Warranty Services, Inc.

Mark Victor

Omnisure Group, LLC

Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Eric D Fein

Attorney at Attorney at Law

15455 N. Dallas Parkway, Suite 1225

Addison, TX 75001

Michael Burshteyn

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP - San Francisco

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Tiffany Cheung

Attorney at Morrison & Foerster LLP - San Francisco

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Mark Victor. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

15 #1

Exhibit A

#17

(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc. served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (daj, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#2

(#2) Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to National Warranty Services, Inc.. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

2 #1

Magistrate referral

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael Burshteyn on behalf of Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7631400. (Burshteyn, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Omnisure Group, LLC. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

11 #1

Exhibit A

#16

(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#20

(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Craig Cunningham. (daj, ) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#11

(#14) NOTICE by Mark Victor re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Certificate of Service (Fein, Eric) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to David Cunningham. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tiffany Cheung on behalf of Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7631355. (Cheung, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc.. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss by Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Craig Cunningham. (daj, ) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael Burshteyn on behalf of Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7631400. (Burshteyn, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tiffany Cheung on behalf of Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-7631355. (Cheung, Tiffany) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc. served on 12/31/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (daj, ) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Dismiss by Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Melissa) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE of Deficiency regarding the NOTICE submitted DOCUMENT #12 - INCORRECT DOCKET EVENT USED FOR FILING. Correction should be made by ONE BUSINESS DAY (baf, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE by Mark Victor re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Certificate of Service (Fein, Eric) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Rule 26(f) attorney conference on or before: January 30, 2020. File joint report of attorney conference: February 13, 2020. The case is SET for a Rule 16 management conference February 28, 2020, at2:00 p.m., in the United States Courthouse Annex, 200 N. Travis St., Sherman,Texas 75090. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak on 1/9/2020. (daj, ) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT - PLEASE DISREGARD*** MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Amended Certificate of Service by Mark Victor. (Fein, Eric) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2020: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (daj, ). Modified on 1/10/2020 (baf, ). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Craig Cunningham. David Cunningham served on 12/18/2019, answer due 1/8/2020. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 400, receipt number 6-50300 (gsg) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Omnisure Group, LLC. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to Interstate National Dealer Services, Inc.. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to David Cunningham. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Mark Victor. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to National Warranty Services, Inc.. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to plaintiff. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.