This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:32:11 (UTC).

Cunningham v. Matrix Financial Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Cunningham filed an Other lawsuit against Matrix Financial Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine A. Nowak and Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00896

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christine A. Nowak

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Craig Cunningham

Plano, TX 75075

Defendants

National Car Cure, LLC

Matrix Financial Services, LLC

Zander Collins & Smith

David Glenwinkel

Sing for Service, LLC, dba MEPCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Andrew Ross Kasner

Attorney at McDowell Hetherington LLP - Houston

1001 Fannin Street, Suite 2700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Matrix Financial Services, LLC are hereby DISMISSED. All other claims remain. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/20/2020. (daj, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#10

(#10) Plaintiff's NOTICE of Nonsuit for Defendant Matrix Financial Services, LLC only, by Craig Cunningham (daj, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#9

(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Matrix Financial Services, LLC.( Kasner, Andrew) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Ross Kasner on behalf of Matrix Financial Services, LLC (Kasner, Andrew) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Sing for Service, LLC, dba MEPCO. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to David Glenwinkel. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Zander Collins & Smith. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to National Car Cure, LLC. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Matrix Financial Services, LLC. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

2 #1

Magistrate referral

#2

(#2) Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER OF PARTIAL DISMISSAL. ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Matrix Financial Services, LLC are hereby DISMISSED. All other claims remain. Signed by District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III on 1/20/2020. (daj, ) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Plaintiff's NOTICE of Nonsuit for Defendant Matrix Financial Services, LLC only, by Craig Cunningham (daj, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Matrix Financial Services, LLC to 1/31/2020. 28 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( daj, ) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Matrix Financial Services, LLC.( Kasner, Andrew) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Ross Kasner on behalf of Matrix Financial Services, LLC (Kasner, Andrew) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketFiling fee received: $ 400, receipt number 6-50300 (gsg) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued as to Sing for Service, LLC, dba MEPCO. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued as to David Glenwinkel. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Zander Collins & Smith. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to National Car Cure, LLC. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Matrix Financial Services, LLC. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. **Consent form mailed to plaintiff. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Case assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III and referred to Magistrate Judge Christine A. Nowak. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate referral) (daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Craig Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(daj, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.