Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/16/2019 at 07:13:14 (UTC).

Cunningham v. Lyft, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/17/2019 Cunningham filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Lyft, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Indira Talwani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-11974

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Massachusetts District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Indira Talwani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melody Cunningham

Defendants

Lyft, Inc.

Logan Green

John Zimmer

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shannon E. Liss-Riordan

Attorney at Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.

729 Boylston Street, Suite 2000

Boston, MA 02116

Adelaide H. Pagano

Attorney at Lichten & Liss-Riordan, P.C.

729 Boylston Street, Suite 2000

Boston, MA 02116

Defendant Attorneys

David J. Santeusanio

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

10 St. James Avenue, Suite 12

Boston, MA 02116

Jeffrey Y Wu

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue, 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Adele M. El-Khouri

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

1155 F. Street Nw 7Th Floor

Washington, DC 20004-1361

Andrew E. Silvia

Attorney at Holland & Knight (B)

10 St. James Avenue, 11Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02116

Justin P Raphael

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

James D. Smeallie

Attorney at Holland & Knight (B)

10 St. James Avenue, 11Th Flr.

Boston, MA 02116

Rohit K Singla

Attorney at MUNGER, TOLLES & OLSON LLP

560 Mission Street, 27Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Michael T. Maroney

Attorney at Holland & Knight, LLP

10 St. James Avenue

Boston, MA 02116

 

Court Documents

53 #1

Exhibit A

#53

(#53) REPLY to Response to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support thereof filed by Melody Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#52

(#52) REPLY to Response to #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Smeallie, James) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

37 #8

Exhibit H

37 #7

Exhibit G

37 #6

Exhibit F

37 #5

Exhibit E

#37

(#51) ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #37 Opposition to Motion,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by 11/15/2019. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, contain appropriate (number/letter) tabs, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a 3-ring binder. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#16

(#52) REPLY to Response to #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Smeallie, James) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Smeallie on behalf of Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer (Smeallie, James) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#4

(#53) REPLY to Response to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support thereof filed by Melody Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

1 #5

Proposed Summons - Logan Green

1 #4

Proposed Summons - John Zimmer

1 #3

Proposed Summons - Lyft Inc.

1 #2

Category Form for New Civil Cases

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Zimmer, Logan Green, Lyft, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7881923 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Melody Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form for New Civil Cases, #3 Proposed Summons - Lyft Inc., #4 Proposed Summons - John Zimmer, #5 Proposed Summons - Logan Green)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

66 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#53) REPLY to Response to #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support thereof filed by Melody Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#52) REPLY to Response to #16 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer. (Smeallie, James) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#51) ELECTRONIC NOTICE issued requesting courtesy copy for #37 Opposition to Motion,. Counsel who filed this document are requested to submit a courtesy copy of this document (or documents) to the Clerk's Office by 11/15/2019. These documents must be clearly marked as a Courtesy Copy, contain appropriate (number/letter) tabs, reflect the document number assigned by CM/ECF, and be placed in a 3-ring binder. (Vieira, Leonardo) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#50) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Laura M. Brown. (Smeallie, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#49) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Steven Charles. (Smeallie, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#48) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Bruno De Souza. (Smeallie, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Paul Gemmell. (Smeallie, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of David Moyer. (Smeallie, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #39 Affidavit in Support of Stephen Sainte-Martin. (Smeallie, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #38 Opposition to Motion of Eden G. Sellassie. (Smeallie, James) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
33 More Docket Entries
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Transfer Case to Judge Stearns by Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer.(Smeallie, James) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lyft, Inc.. (Smeallie, James) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew E. Silvia on behalf of Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer (Silvia, Andrew) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T. Maroney on behalf of Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer (Maroney, Michael) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance by David J. Santeusanio on behalf of Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer (Santeusanio, David) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by James D. Smeallie on behalf of Logan Green, Lyft, Inc., John Zimmer (Smeallie, James) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Memorandum of Law in Support thereof by Melody Cunningham.(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • (#2) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Indira Talwani assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against John Zimmer, Logan Green, Lyft, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7881923 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Melody Cunningham. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form for New Civil Cases, #3 Proposed Summons - Lyft Inc., #4 Proposed Summons - John Zimmer, #5 Proposed Summons - Logan Green)(Liss-Riordan, Shannon) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lyft, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Y. Wu

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew E. Silvia