This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2021 at 09:22:56 (UTC).

Cunningham v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 Cunningham filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JUAN R. SANCHEZ. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00526

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JUAN R. SANCHEZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sherrilene Cunningham

Defendants

ETHICON, LLC

ETHICON INC

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHELLE L. TIGER

Attorney at KLINE & SPECTER, PC

1525 Locust St, 19Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

CHRISTOPHER A. GOMEZ

Attorney at KLINE & SPECTER

1525 Locust St 18Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19102

LEE B. BALEFSKY

Attorney at KLINE & SPECTER

1525 Locust Street, 19Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

JULIA MARY RAFFERTY

Attorney at CAMPBELL CONROY & O'NEIL, P.C.

1205 Westlakes Drive, Suite 330

Berwyn, PA 19312

JO E. PEIFER

Attorney at CAMPBELL CONROY & O'NEIL, P.C.

1205 Westlakes Drive, Suite 330

Berwyn, PA 19312

JOSEPH E. O'NEIL

Attorney at Campbell Conroy & O'Neil

1205 Westlakes Drive, Suite 330

Berwyn, PA 19312

WILLIAM M. GAGE

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW O'MARA STEVENS & CANNADA

P.O. Box 22567

Jackson, MS 39225-2567

JOHN J. O'DONNELL

Attorney at Campbell Conroy & O'Neil, P.C.

1205 Westlakes Drive, Suite 330

Berwyn, PA 19312

KARI L. SUTHERLAND

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW O'MARA, STEVENS & CANNADA, PLLC

1200 Jefferson Avenue, Suite 205

Oxford, MS 38655

DAVID B. THOMAS

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN PLLC

300 Summers St Ste 1380, Pobox 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

MOLLY ELIZABETH FLYNN

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

One Logan Square, Suite 2000

Philadelphia, PA 19103

SUSAN M. ROBINSON

Attorney at THOMAS COMBS & SPANN PLLC

300 Summers St Ste 1380, Pobox 3824

Charleston, WV 25338-3824

CHRISTY D. JONES

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

1020 Highland Colony Pkwy, Suite 1400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

#57

#56

#55

#54

#53

RESTRICTED

#52

51 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#51

#50

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

114 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDocument #55 mailed to attorneys. (kw, ) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) ORDER THAT THE NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT IN PRINCIPLE AND JOINT MOTION TO STAY IS GRANTED. ALL PROCEEDINGS ARE STAYED PENDING FURTHER COURT ORDER. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/25/21.2/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) ORDER THAT THE MOTION OF KLINE & SPECTER PC TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD IS GRANTED AND THE FOLLOWING COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF ARE HEREBY WITHDRAWN FROM THIS MATTER: MICHELLE L. TIGER. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/25/21.2/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) ORDER THAT THE MOTION TO WITHDRAW MDL COUNSEL IS GRANTED. THE FOLLOWING COUNSEL OF RECORD ARE HEREBY WITHDRAWN AND THE CLERK'S OFFICE IS DIRECTED TO REMOVE THEM FROM THE COURT'S CM/ECF SYSTEM FOR THIS ACTION: CHRISTY D. JONES, BUTLER SNOW, LLP, WILLIAM M. GAGE, BUTLER SNOW, LLP, KARI L. SUTHERLAND, BUTLER SNOW, LLP, DAVID B. THOMAS, THOMAS COMBS & SPANN PLLC AND SUSAN M. ROBINSON, THOMAS COMBS & SPANN, PLLC. SIGNED BY CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ ON 2/25/21.2/25/21 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO ATTY AND E-MAILED.(mbh, ) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE by ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON TO WITHDRAW DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT WITHOUT PREJUDICE (FLYNN, MOLLY) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Minute Entry for proceedings held before CHIEF JUDGE JUAN R. SANCHEZ Telephone Conference held on 2/22/21 (mbh, ) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketPLEADING #52 MAILED TO COUNSEL (JL ) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE TIMOTHY R. RICE; ETC.. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 2/16/21. 2/16/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL ) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney of Michelle Tiger filed by Sherrilene Cunningham.Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(BALEFSKY, LEE) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Joint MOTION to Stay ALL PROCEEDINGS AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT IN PRINCIPLE filed by ETHICON INC, JOHNSON & JOHNSON.Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(FLYNN, MOLLY) (Entered: 02/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Dr. Erik Smith on 3/14/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 01/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PRETRIAL ORDER # 280 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 8 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING ETHICON, INC. CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 8 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. For any cases in the Ethicon, Inc. MDL with a Covidien Wave 1 flag, the stay on the flagged Covidien Wave 1 cases is lifted and the Covidien Wave 1 cases in the Ethicon MDL are incorporated in the Ethicon, Inc., Wave 8 cases and subject to this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 8 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 8 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 8 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (klc) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Sherrilene Cunningham. (Gomez, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 06/08/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 03/14/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 02/28/2014)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 11/14/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 76 (Final Order Regarding Severance of Actions) entered on 10/10/2013 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/17/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ethicon, Inc., Ethicon, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (tmh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-2707221. (Attachment: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tmh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 2/8/2021.] (Entered: 10/11/2013)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle L. Tiger

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A Gomez