This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2019 at 08:30:00 (UTC).

Cunningham v. Entzel, Warden

Case Summary

On 10/02/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by Cunningham against Entzel, Warden in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01320

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sara Darrow

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Teovonni Cunningham

Pekin, IL 61555

Respondent

Frederick Entzel, Warden

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Greggory R Walters

Attorney at US ATTY

One Technology Plaza, Suite 400, 211 Fulton St

Peoria, IL 61602

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) RESPONDENT'S SUR-REPLY filed by Respondent Frederick Entzel, Warden. (RL, ilcd) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

#6

(#6) Reply Motion under 28 USC 2241 filed by Petitioner Teovonni Cunningham. (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

7 #1

Appendix

#3

(#3) RESPONSE to Motion re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Frederick Entzel, Warden. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Publicly Filed) to Response)(Walters, Greggory) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Seal by Respondent Frederick Entzel, Warden. Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Appendix (UNDER SEAL) to Response)(Walters, Greggory) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

4 #1

*Restricted*

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Petitioner Teovonni Cunningham. (RL, ilcd) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Teovonni Cunningham.(RL, ilcd) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Respondent Frederick Entzel, Warden. Responses due by 11/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Walters, Greggory) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

3 #1

Appendix (Publicly Filed) to Response

#2

(#2) ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/16/2019: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall serve upon Respondent, or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon its attorney, a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. Petitioner shall include with the original paper to be filed with the Clerk of the Court a certificate stating the date that a true and correct copy of any document was mailed to Respondent or its counsel. Any paper received by this Court that has not been filed with the Clerk or that fails to include a certificate of service will be disregarded by the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner immediately notify the Court of any change in his mailing address. Failure to notify the Court of any change in mailing address will result indismissal of this lawsuit, with prejudice. (RL, ilcd) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to #7 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply filed by Petitioner Teovonni Cunningham. (RL, ilcd) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RESPONDENT'S SUR-REPLY filed by Respondent Frederick Entzel, Warden. (RL, ilcd) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 11/12/2019: Respondent has filed a Motion to file a Sur-Reply (d/e #7 ). Respondent seeks to file a sur-reply to respond to an argument Petitioner raised for the first time in his reply. Respondents Motion (d/e #7 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to docket Respondents Sur-Reply (d/e [7-1]) attached to Respondents Motion.(RL, ilcd) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by Respondent Frederick Entzel, Warden. Responses due by 11/21/2019 (Attachments: #1 Appendix)(Walters, Greggory) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Reply Motion under 28 USC 2241 filed by Petitioner Teovonni Cunningham. (ED, ilcd) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/18/2019: Respondent's Motion #4 to Seal presentence report materials is GRANTED. The presentence report materials at docket entry #5 , shall remain sealed. These materials also appear to have inadvertently been placed on the public record under docket entry [4-1]. The Clerk is DIRECTED to seal docket entry [4-1] as well. (RL, ilcd) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) +++ SEALED DOCUMENT.. (Walters, Greggory) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Seal by Respondent Frederick Entzel, Warden. Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Attachments: #1 Appendix (UNDER SEAL) to Response)(Walters, Greggory) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RESPONSE to Motion re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Respondent Frederick Entzel, Warden. (Attachments: #1 Appendix (Publicly Filed) to Response)(Walters, Greggory) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/16/2019: IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner shall serve upon Respondent, or, if appearance has been entered by counsel, upon its attorney, a copy of every further pleading or other document submitted for consideration by the Court. Petitioner shall include with the original paper to be filed with the Clerk of the Court a certificate stating the date that a true and correct copy of any document was mailed to Respondent or its counsel. Any paper received by this Court that has not been filed with the Clerk or that fails to include a certificate of service will be disregarded by the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner immediately notify the Court of any change in his mailing address. Failure to notify the Court of any change in mailing address will result indismissal of this lawsuit, with prejudice. (RL, ilcd) (Entered: 10/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2019
  • Receipt#44626003670 for $5.00 for Filing Fee. (RL, ilcd) (Entered: 10/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 10/04/2019: : Petitioner has filed a Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Petitioner is directed to either pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner shall do so on or before November 4, 2019, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send Petitioner a copy of the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis.(RL, ilcd) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Teovonni Cunningham.(RL, ilcd) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.