This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2022 at 08:53:14 (UTC).

Cunningham et al v. Oxford Community School District et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Cunningham filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Oxford Community School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gershwin A. Drain and Curtis Ivy, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-11398

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gershwin A. Drain

Referral Judge

Curtis Ivy, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sandra A. Cunningham

P.A.

Defendants

Oxford Community School District

Timothy Throne

Steven Wolf

Nicholas Ejak

Shawn Hopkins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Wolf Mueller

Attorney at Mueller Law Firm

41850 W. 11 Mile Road, Suite 101

Novi, MI 48375

Defendant Attorneys

Annabel F. Shea

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 West Big Beaver Road, 10Th Floor

Troy, MI 48084

John L. Miller

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins,

101 W. Big Beaver Road

Troy, MI 48084

Kenneth B. Chapie

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

10Th Floor Columbia Center, 101 West Big Beaver Rd.

Troy, MI 48084-5280

Timothy J. Mullins

Attorney at Giarmarco, Mullins & Horton, P.C.

101 W. Big Beaver Rd., 10Th Floor

Troy, MI 48084

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sandra A. Cunningham, P.A. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8955860 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court, 22-cv-11250, Judge Mark Goldsmith] (Mueller, Wolf) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Nicholas Ejak, Shawn Hopkins, Oxford Community School District, Timothy Throne, Steven Wolf* (DAll) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Shawn Hopkins waiver sent on 7/12/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Mueller, Wolf) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Nicholas Ejak waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Mueller, Wolf) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Steven Wolf waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Mueller, Wolf) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Timothy Throne waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Mueller, Wolf) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Oxford Community School District waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Mueller, Wolf) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of All Defendants. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B. Chapie on behalf of All Defendants. (Chapie, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Annabel F. Shea on behalf of All Defendants. (Shea, Annabel) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Miller on behalf of All Defendants. (Miller, John) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by John L. Miller on behalf of All Defendants. (Miller, John) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Annabel F. Shea on behalf of All Defendants. (Shea, Annabel) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth B. Chapie on behalf of All Defendants. (Chapie, Kenneth) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Mullins on behalf of All Defendants. (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Oxford Community School District waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Mueller, Wolf) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Timothy Throne waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Mueller, Wolf) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Steven Wolf waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Mueller, Wolf) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Nicholas Ejak waiver sent on 7/11/2022, answer due 9/9/2022. (Mueller, Wolf) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Shawn Hopkins waiver sent on 7/12/2022, answer due 9/12/2022. (Mueller, Wolf) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (DAll) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Nicholas Ejak, Shawn Hopkins, Oxford Community School District, Timothy Throne, Steven Wolf* (DAll) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Sandra A. Cunningham, P.A. against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8955860 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): United States District Court, 22-cv-11250, Judge Mark Goldsmith] (Mueller, Wolf) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less