This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2021 at 08:51:29 (UTC).

Cunningham et al v. Norris et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2021 Cunningham filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Norris. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Jodi F Jayne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Jodi F Jayne

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Johnny Cunningham

Brenda Cunningham

Defendants

JMN Transportation, Inc.

Jeffrey Blaine Norris

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

George Michael Miles

Attorney at Frasier Frasier & Hickman

1700 Sw Blvd #100

Tulsa, OK 74107

Frank W Frasier, III

Attorney at Frasier Frasier & Hickman

1700 Sw Blvd #100

Tulsa, OK 74107

James Edward Frasier

Attorney at Frasier Frasier & Hickman

1700 Sw Blvd #100

Tulsa, OK 74107

Steven R Hickman

Attorney at Frasier Frasier & Hickman

1700 Sw Blvd #100

Tulsa, OK 74107

Defendant Attorney

Harris A Phillips, III

Attorney at Pettigrew Lewis & Phillips, P.C.

211 East Gray Street

Norman, OK 73069

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) OPINION AND ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan ; denying #8 Motion to Remand (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan (Initial), setting/resetting scheduling order date(s): ( Discovery due by 12/1/2021, Dispositive Motions due by 1/5/2022, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/22/2022, Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2022 at 10:30 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan, Jury Trial set for 3/21/2022 at 09:15 AM before Judge Claire V Eagan) (crp, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Brenda Cunningham, Johnny Cunningham (Frasier, James) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #8 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) by Brenda Cunningham, Johnny Cunningham ; (Hickman, Steven) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Remand (Re: #8 MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support ) by JMN Transportation, Inc., Jeffrey Blaine Norris ; (Phillips, Harris) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Remand and Brief in Support by Brenda Cunningham, Johnny Cunningham [Note: Attorney Steven R Hickman added to party Brenda Cunningham(pty:pla), Attorney Steven R Hickman added to party Johnny Cunningham(pty:pla).] (Hickman, Steven) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan , directing parties to file joint status report ( Status Report due by 7/14/2021) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing JMN Transportation, Inc. to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (lmt, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by JMN Transportation, Inc. (Phillips, Harris) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Harris A Phillips, III on behalf of JMN Transportation, Inc., Jeffrey Blaine Norris (Phillips, Harris) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by JMN Transportation, Inc., Jeffrey Blaine Norris (Phillips, Harris) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal with Jury Demand from Mayes County, case number CJ-2020-207 (paid $402 filing fee; receipt number AOKNDC-2426096) by JMN Transportation, Inc., Jeffrey Blaine Norris (With attachments) (Phillips, Harris) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by JMN Transportation, Inc., Jeffrey Blaine Norris [Note: Attorney Harris A Phillips, III added to party JMN Transportation, Inc. (pty:dft).] (Phillips, Harris) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed in State Court against JMN Transportation, Inc., Jeffrey Blaine Norris by Brenda Cunningham, Johnny Cunningham (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harris A Phillips, III(Designation Retained)