This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 15:19:05 (UTC).

Cunningham v. Advantix Digital LLC

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 Cunningham filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Advantix Digital LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is A. Joe Fish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00210

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

A. Joe Fish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Taylore Cunningham

Defendants

Advantix Digital LLC

Advantix Internet Marketing LLC

Not Classified By Court

ADR Provider

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tailim Song

Attorney at Tailim Song Law Firm

13140 Coit Rd, Suite 350

Dallas, TX 75240

Defendant Attorneys

Ashley Scheer

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

2323 Ross Avenue, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

David Robert Schlottman

Attorney at Jackson Walker LLP

2323 Ross Avenue, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75201

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Courtenay L Bass

Attorney at Gilbert Mediation Group

12001 N Central Expressway, Ste 650

Dallas, TX 75243

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) BILL OF COSTS by Advantix Digital LLC. (Schlottman, David) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#66

(#66) JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED 1. that Advantix Digital LLC's #21 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; 2. Judgment is entered in favor of Advantix Digital LLC; and 3. This case is CLOSED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/20/2020) (twd) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#65

(#65) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the defendant's #21 Motion for Summary Judgment. Advantix's objections to Cunningham's summary judgment evidence are DENIED as moot. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/20/2020) (twd) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

#64

(#64) ORDER: All pretrial deadlines are STAYED pending rulings on all motions currently pending before the court in this action. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/2/2020) (mla) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

63 #6

Exhibit(s) Exhibit F

63 #5

Exhibit(s) Exhibit E

63 #2

Exhibit(s) Exhibit B

63 #1

Exhibit(s) Exhibit A

#21

(#62) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Taylore Cunningham re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Song, Tailim) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

#9

(#9) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 5/2/2019. See order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/10/2019) (lag/chmb) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Scheer on behalf of Advantix Digital LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Scheer, Ashley) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advantix Digital LLC. (Schlottman, David) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Advantix Digital LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney David Robert Schlottman added to party Advantix Digital LLC(pty:dft) (Schlottman, David) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Advantix Digital LLC; served on 3/18/2019. (Song, Tailim) Modified date of service on 3/20/2019 (dsr). (Entered: 03/19/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Advantix Digital LLC. (mla) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#3

(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Taylore Cunningham. (Song, Tailim) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

#1

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Advantix Digital LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney David Robert Schlottman added to party Advantix Digital LLC(pty:dft) (Schlottman, David) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

128 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) BILL OF COSTS by Advantix Digital LLC. (Schlottman, David) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED 1. that Advantix Digital LLC's #21 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED; 2. Judgment is entered in favor of Advantix Digital LLC; and 3. This case is CLOSED. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/20/2020) (twd) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting the defendant's #21 Motion for Summary Judgment. Advantix's objections to Cunningham's summary judgment evidence are DENIED as moot. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/20/2020) (twd) (Entered: 04/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ORDER: All pretrial deadlines are STAYED pending rulings on all motions currently pending before the court in this action. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/2/2020) (mla) (Entered: 04/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) Appendix in Support filed by Taylore Cunningham re #62 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit F) (Song, Tailim) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Taylore Cunningham re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Song, Tailim) (Entered: 03/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) RESPONSE filed by Advantix Digital LLC re: #56 Response/Objection, #58 Response/Objection (Schlottman, David) (Entered: 02/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ORDER granting #53 Motion to Compel; denying #34 Motion to Strike. The defendant shall complete its deposition of the plaintiff by no later than 2/21/2020. The plaintiff shall complete her deposition of Mr. Bentahar by no later than 2/21/2020. Should the parties wish to submit supplemental briefing based upon testimony obtained during the aforementioned depositions, they shall do so no later than 3/6/2020. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/7/2020) (rekc) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) RESPONSE AND OBJECTION filed by Advantix Digital LLC re: #53 MOTION to Compel Deposition of Amine Bentahar (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Schlottman, David) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) RESPONSE filed by Taylore Cunningham re: #56 Response/Objection (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A) (Song, Tailim) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
47 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Taylore Cunningham. (Song, Tailim) (Entered: 04/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 5/2/2019. See order for specifics. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 4/10/2019) (lag/chmb) (Entered: 04/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ashley Scheer on behalf of Advantix Digital LLC. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Scheer, Ashley) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Advantix Digital LLC. (Schlottman, David) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Advantix Digital LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney David Robert Schlottman added to party Advantix Digital LLC(pty:dft) (Schlottman, David) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Advantix Digital LLC; served on 3/18/2019. (Song, Tailim) Modified date of service on 3/20/2019 (dsr). (Entered: 03/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Advantix Digital LLC. (mla) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Rutherford). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (mla) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Taylore Cunningham. (Song, Tailim) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Advantix Digital LLC filed by Taylore Cunningham. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-9735203) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Song, Tailim) (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Courtenay L Bass