This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:25:27 (UTC).

Cummings v. Safeco Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Cummings filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbara J. Rothstein. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01978

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Barbara J. Rothstein

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Julia Cummings

Defendant

Safeco Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeff Bone

Attorney at CORR CRONIN, LLP

1001 4Th Ave, Ste 3900

Seattle, WA 98154-1051

Emma S Grunberg

Attorney at CORR CRONIN, LLP

1001 4Th Ave, Ste 3900

Seattle, WA 98154-1051

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew S Adams

Attorney at FORSBERG & UMLAUF (SEA)

901 5Th Ave, Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98164-1039

Galina Kletser Jakobson

Attorney at FORSBERG & UMLAUF (SEA)

901 5Th Ave, Ste 1400

Seattle, WA 98164-1039

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/28/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/4/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

#7

(#7) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Julia Cummings (Bone, Jeff) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

5 #2

Exhibit 2

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jakobson, Galina) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc for Safeco Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Jakobson, Galina) Modified on 12/5/2019 to add additional corporate parents (KB). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#3) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (Jakobson, Galina) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

2 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3

2 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2

2 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1

#2

(#2) DECLARATION of Galina Kletser Jakobson in Support of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Jakobson, Galina) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Complaint

1 #1

Summons

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-05536-7 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-6035419), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jakobson, Galina) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STANDING ORDER FOR ALL CIVIL CASES. The procedures in this Order supplement, and in some cases, supersede the local rules. The parties are responsible for being familiar with the procedures in this Order. Failure to comply with the procedures may result in sanctions. Signed by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report due by 2/11/2020, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/28/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/4/2020, by Judge Barbara J. Rothstein. (RM) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Julia Cummings (Bone, Jeff) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (GT) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketJudge Barbara J. Rothstein added. (GT) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Jakobson, Galina) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Safeco Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc for Safeco Insurance Company of America. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Jakobson, Galina) Modified on 12/5/2019 to add additional corporate parents (KB). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (Jakobson, Galina) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) DECLARATION of Galina Kletser Jakobson in Support of Notice of Removal re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4)(Jakobson, Galina) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 19-2-05536-7 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-6035419), filed by Safeco Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jakobson, Galina) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.