This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2019 at 07:18:38 (UTC).

Dennis Culver v. Unilever United States, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Dennis Culver filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Unilever United States, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are George H. Wu and Rozella A. Oliver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-09263

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

Referral Judge

Rozella A. Oliver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Culver

Defendant

Unilever United States, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin Heikali

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi LLP

10866 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1470

Los Angeles, CA 90024

George Volney Granade

Attorney at Reese LLP

8484 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 515

Los Angeles, CA 90211

Michael R Reese

Attorney at Reese LLP

100 West 93Rd Street 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10025

Sue J Nam

Attorney at Reese LLP

100 West 93Rd Street 16Th Floor

New York, NY 10025

Joshua Nassir

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi LLP

10866 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1470

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Defendant Attorneys

Spencer Sean McManus

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

Claudia Maria Vetesi

Attorney at Morrison and Foerster LLP

425 Market Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2482

 

Court Documents

#15

14 #2

Proposed Order

14 #1

Declaration Of Spencer McManus

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, Granting Joint Stipulation to Set Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss #14 . SEE DOCUMENT FOR FURTHER INFORMATION. (twdb) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1/30/20 filed by Defendant Unilever United States, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of Spencer McManus, #2 Proposed Order)(Vetesi, Claudia) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Spencer Sean McManus on behalf of Defendant Unilever United States, Inc. (Attorney Spencer Sean McManus added to party Unilever United States, Inc.(pty:dft))(McManus, Spencer) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Unilever United States, Inc., identifying Unilever United States, Inc., Unilever PLC, Unilever N.V.. (Vetesi, Claudia) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Claudia Maria Vetesi on behalf of Defendant Unilever United States, Inc. (Attorney Claudia Maria Vetesi added to party Unilever United States, Inc.(pty:dft))(Vetesi, Claudia) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Dennis Culver. upon Unilever United States, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/31/2019, answer due 12/30/2019. Waiver of Service signed by Unilever United States, Inc.. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. Case transferred from Judge Christina A. Snyder to the calendar of Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:19-cv-09263 GW(RAOx). (rn) (Entered: 10/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Unilever United States, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Dennis Culver, (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Dennis Culver. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dennis Culver. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24683533 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Dennis Culver. (Attorney Benjamin Heikali added to party Dennis Culver(pty:pla))(Heikali, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Nassir

Latest cases represented by Lawyer George Volney Granade