This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:08:55 (UTC).

CULVER v. STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 CULVER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is JOHN R. PADOVA. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05718

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

JOHN R. PADOVA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCUS CULVER

Defendants

PAULA TECHOCK

STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JOEL S. ROSEN

Attorney at COHEN PLACITELLA & ROTH

Two Commerce Square Suite 2900, 2001 Market St.

Philadelphia, PA 19103

ERIC S. PASTERNACK

Attorney at COHEN PLACITELLA & ROTH PC

2001 Market St Suite 2900

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorneys

LOUIS E. BRICKLIN

Attorney at BENNETT BRICKLIN & SALTZBURG LLC

1500 Market Street, 32Nd Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19102

MICHAEL SALTZBURG

Attorney at BENNETT BRICKLIN & SALTZBURG LLP

1601 Market St., 16Th Fl

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Hearing:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/28/2020 At 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (Attachments: #1Notice to Counsel, #2Scheduling Information Report)(mwol, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT, PAULA TECHOCK, IS DISMISSED AS A DEFENDANT FROM THIS MATTER WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 12/17/2019. 12/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

7 #1

Appendix Notice to Counsel

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(SALTZBURG, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, PAULA TECHOCK from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 191003628. PROOF OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 411 receipt number PPE207780)(bw, ) Modified on 12/6/2019 (bw, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/6/2019) (bw, ). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL SALTZBURG on behalf of STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY (SALTZBURG, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC S. PASTERNACK on behalf of MARCUS CULVER (PASTERNACK, ERIC) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/24/20. 1/27/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY for STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, PAULA TECHOCK.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

7 #2

Appendix Scheduling Information Report

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 41.1(b). SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 1/24/20. 1/27/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(jl, ) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC S. PASTERNACK on behalf of MARCUS CULVER (PASTERNACK, ERIC) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Hearing:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SET FOR 1/28/2020 At 10:00 AM IN JUDGE CHAMBERS BEFORE HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA. (Attachments: #1Notice to Counsel, #2Scheduling Information Report)(mwol, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY.(SALTZBURG, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL SALTZBURG on behalf of STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY (SALTZBURG, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT, PAULA TECHOCK, IS DISMISSED AS A DEFENDANT FROM THIS MATTER WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 12/17/2019. 12/18/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(amas) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • (#3) Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of PHILADELPHIA County. (amas) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Case Ineligible for Arbitration (Case Flagged ELARB in Error) (nd, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Case Eligible for Arbitration(bw, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 Identifying Corporate Parent STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY for STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY. by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, PAULA TECHOCK.(bw, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by STATE FARM FIRE AND CASUALTY COMPANY, PAULA TECHOCK from COURT OF COMMON PLEAS PHILADELPHIA COUNTY, PENNSYLVANIA, case number 191003628. PROOF OF SERVICE. (Filing fee $ 411 receipt number PPE207780)(bw, ) Modified on 12/6/2019 (bw, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/6/2019) (bw, ). (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.