This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2020 at 07:38:52 (UTC).

CULPEPPER et al v. HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/19/2019 CULPEPPER filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00195

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILLIAM L DUCK, JR

CASEY CULPEPPER

Defendant

HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shannon F. Land

P.O. Box 2848

Columbus, GA 31902

JERRY A BUCHANAN

Po Box 2848

Columbus, GA 31902

TRISHA HARGROVE

P. O. Box 2848

Columbus, GA 31902

Defendant Attorneys

ELIZABETH J BONDURANT

Attorney at Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP

271 17Th Street Nw, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30363-1017

JOHN GREGORY PERRY

271 17Th St Nw Ste 2400

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

#8

#7

6 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#6

5 #1

Required Form

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER:Discovery to be complete by 7/1/2020. Dispositive motions due by 7/31/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 1/3/2020. (esl) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by TRISHA HARGROVE on behalf of CASEY CULPEPPER, WILLIAM L DUCK, JR Attorney TRISHA HARGROVE added to party CASEY CULPEPPER(pty:pla), Attorney TRISHA HARGROVE added to party WILLIAM L DUCK, JR(pty:pla) (HARGROVE, TRISHA) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by CASEY CULPEPPER, WILLIAM L DUCK, JR filed by JERRY A BUCHANAN. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(BUCHANAN, JERRY) (Entered: 12/31/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULES 16/26 ORDER:Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 1/2/2020. Ordered by US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 12/2/2019. (Attachments: #1 Required Form)(far) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY.(BONDURANT, ELIZABETH) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY. (PERRY, JOHN) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency; Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY; Pursuant to Local Rule 87.1, all nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement and pursuant to Local Rule 87.2 a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed. Please file the required statements immediately (tlf). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Consent Form (28 USC 636(c)(1)) sent to CASEY CULPEPPER and WILLIAM L. DUCK JR. (tlf). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Deficiency; No need to re-file; Related document: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY; Parties were added using punctuation AND/OR title capitalization. The case opening guide states ***REMINDER*** all parties must be added using ALL CAPS (ie LISA SMITH or DELTA AIRLINES). Do not use ANY punctuation when adding new parties. For instructions on adding parties, please refer to the Style Guide located on the website for the Middle District of Georgia. Additionally, exhibits must be include a description. The CM/ECF procedures manual provides as follows: "A generic identifier such as Exhibit A or Exhibit 1 is not acceptable. The description must be of sufficient detail to make the attachment readily identifiable to the court." (tlf). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • DocketAdded US DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. US DISTRICT JUDGE CLAY D. LAND no longer assigned to case (tlf). (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Casey Culpepper, William L. Duck Fee paid: Receipt # AGAMDC-3319843, $400 filed by HARTFORD LIFE AND ACCIDENT INSURANCE COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(PERRY, JOHN) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less