This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 14:29:59 (UTC).

Culp v. Entzel

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Culp filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Entzel. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is James E. Shadid. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01250

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James E. Shadid

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Edwin Culp

Pekin, IL 61555

Respondent

Frederick Entzel

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorneys

W. Scott Simpson

Attorney at UNITED STATES ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

318 S Sixth Street

Springfield, IL 62701-1806

Katherine Virginia Boyle

Attorney at US ATTY

201 South Vine

Urbana, IL 61802

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent Frederick Entzel. Responses due by 9/10/2020 (Boyle, Katherine) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Substitute Attorney, W. Scott Simpson to be replaced by Katherine V. Boyle, by Respondent Frederick Entzel. Responses due by 9/3/2020 (Boyle, Katherine) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Edwin Culp. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/6/20. The Court has reviewed the Petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243, 2241, and Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Proceedings for the United States District Courts and finds that summary dismissal is not warranted. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER (FDS, ilcd) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Edwin Culp.(FDS, ilcd) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • DocketText Order: The motion to substitute Attorney Boyle for Attorney Simpson is granted. [3.] The clerk is directed to terminate Attorney Simpson. Respondents motion to extend the deadline for filing a response to the petition is granted. [4.] The response deadline is extended to September 8, 2020. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/28/2020. (AEM, ilcd) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Respondent Frederick Entzel. Responses due by 9/10/2020 (Boyle, Katherine) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Substitute Attorney, W. Scott Simpson to be replaced by Katherine V. Boyle, by Respondent Frederick Entzel. Responses due by 9/3/2020 (Boyle, Katherine) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/27/2020 (JRK, ilcd) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER re #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Edwin Culp. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 8/6/20. The Court has reviewed the Petition pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2243, 2241, and Rule 4 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Proceedings for the United States District Courts and finds that summary dismissal is not warranted. SEE FULL WRITTEN ORDER (FDS, ilcd) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $5.00, receipt number 14626038078. (JS, ilcd) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketTEXT ORDER: Petitioner has filed a Petition for Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Petitioner is directed to either pay the $5 filing fee or provide the Court with a signed Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs that also includes a copy of his trust fund ledger, certified by the appropriate institutional officer, showing all receipts, expenditures and balances for the last six months. Petitioner shall do so on or before July 31, 2020, or the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send Petitioner a copy of the forms for proceeding in forma pauperis. Entered by Judge James E. Shadid on 7/6/20. (FDS, ilcd) (Entered: 07/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) filed by Edwin Culp.(FDS, ilcd) (Entered: 07/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less