This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/10/2021 at 09:03:32 (UTC).

Cullens et al v. Tucson, City of et al

Case Summary

On 07/12/2021 Cullens filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Tucson, City of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John C Hinderaker and Leslie A Bowman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00273

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John C Hinderaker

Leslie A Bowman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Carlos Londray Cullens

Tucson, AZ 85713

Al-Huda School Tucson

Defendants

Tucson, City of

Arizona Department of Economic Security

Tucson Medical Center

Black Lives Matter

Scott Lucas

Gayle Dean

Heather Lee

Dylan Cox

Antonio Cruz

Terri Howard

Opal Tometi

Andrea Richards

Andrea Colon Collins

University of Arizona

Genesis OB/GYN

Arizona, State of

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

#2

2 #1

Exhibit

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

8 #1

Attachments

#11

#12

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Arizona Department of Economic Security, Gayle Dean, Tucson Medical Center, Tucson, City of, Genesis OB/GYN, Arizona, State of filed by Carlos Londray Cullens.(BAC) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The #1 Complaint filed on 7/12/21 is dismissed with leave to amend. If Cullens intends to file an amended complaint, he must do so by 9/2/21. If Cullens fails to file a timely amendment, this action may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman on 8/11/21. (BAC) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • Docket(#9) Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Party agrees to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum and Ad Testificandum by Carlos Londray Cullens. (Attachments: #1 Attachments)(BAC) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Election Form Deadline mailed (x2) on this date. (BAC) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by a United States Magistrate Judge and Instructions mailed to Carlos Londray Cullens on this date. (BAC) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED this case shall be randomly reassigned. Magistrate Judge Leslie A Bowman having been randomly selected, the parties are advised all future case filings must bear the following case number: CV-21-00273-TUC-LAB. Signed by Judge John C Hinderaker on 7/16/21.(BAC) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (JAM) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This case has been assigned to the Honorable John C Hinderaker. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-273-TUC-JCH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (JAM) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Carlos Londray Cullens. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JAM) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Carlos Londray Cullens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(JAM) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where University of Arizona is a litigant

Latest cases where Arizona Department of Economic Security is a litigant

Latest cases where Tucson Medical Center is a litigant