This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2021 at 08:13:20 (UTC).

Culbertson v. Equifax Information Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Culbertson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph H. McKinley, Jr and H. Brent Brennenstuhl. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00071

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph H. McKinley, Jr

Referral Judge

H. Brent Brennenstuhl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William Jacob Culbertson

Defendants

Equifax Information Services, LLC

GLA Collection Co., Inc.

Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.

Resurgent Receivables, LLC

Sterling, Inc. doing business as Jared-The Galleria of Jewelry

Trans Union, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James H. Lawson

Attorney at Lawson at Law, PLLC

115 S. Sherrin Avenue, Suite 5

Louisville, KY 40207

James R. McKenzie

Attorney at James R. McKenzie Attorney, PLLC

115 S. Sherrin Avenue, Suite 5

Louisville, KY 40207

Defendant Attorneys

John Michael Williams

Attorney at Williams Kilpatrick, PLLC

3151 Beaumont Centre Circle, Suite 375

Lexington, KY 40513

Joseph N. Tucker

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP - Louisville

101 S. Fifth Street, Suite 2500

Louisville, KY 40202

Philip E. Cecil

Attorney at Dinsmore & Shohl LLP - Louisville

101 S. Fifth Street, Suite 2500

Louisville, KY 40202

Wesley R. Abrams

Attorney at Vorys, Sater, Seymour & Pease LLP Cincinnati

301 E. Fourth Street, Suite 3500

Cincinnati, OH 45202

Sandra D. Jansen

Attorney at Schuckit & Associates, PC

4545 Northwestern Drive

Zionsville, IN 46077

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER ON SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/30/2021 granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Equifax's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to 9/20/2021. cc: Counsel(EAS) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

19 #1

Proposed Order Granting Motion

19 #19

Main Document

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Settlement by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., Resurgent Receivables, LLC (Cecil, Philip) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#17

(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Signet Jewelers Limited for Sterling, Inc.. by Sterling, Inc.. (Abrams, Wesley) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

#16

(#16) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Sterling, Inc.. (Abrams, Wesley) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/21/2021 granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that Equifax's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 8/20/2021. cc: Counsel(EAS) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

12 #1

Proposed Order Granting Motion

12 #12

Main Document

1 #8

Exhibit G-Resurgent Receivables, LLC's Consent To Removal

1 #7

Exhibit F-Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.'s Consent To Removal

1 #6

Exhibit E-GLA Collection Co., Inc.'s Consent To Removal

1 #5

Exhibit D-Equifax Information Services, LLC's Consent To Removal

1 #4

Exhibit C-Complaint To Trans Union, LLC

1 #3

Exhibit B-Civil Case Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit A-Summons To Trans Union, LLC

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Order,, #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Case Assignment, #3 Notice (Other) by Defendants Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., Resurgent Receivables, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tucker, Joseph) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • Docket***Answer Date Set to: 9/20/2021 (EAS) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER ON SECOND UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 8/30/2021 granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Equifax's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint is extended to 9/20/2021. cc: Counsel(EAS) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Williams, John) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Settlement by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., Resurgent Receivables, LLC (Cecil, Philip) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Signet Jewelers Limited for Sterling, Inc.. by Sterling, Inc.. (Abrams, Wesley) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Sterling, Inc.. (Abrams, Wesley) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER ON UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/21/2021 granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that Equifax's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to 8/20/2021. cc: Counsel(EAS) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge H. Brent Brennenstuhl on 7/20/2021 granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Resurgent has until 8/12/2021 to file their response to Plaintiff's complaint. cc: Counsel(EAS) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Equifax, Inc. for Equifax Information Services, LLC. by Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Williams, John) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 4 Order,, #1 Notice of Removal,, #2 Case Assignment, #3 Notice (Other) by Defendants Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., Resurgent Receivables, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Tucker, Joseph) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Resurgent Holdings, LLC for Resurgent Receivables, LLC. by Resurgent Receivables, LLC. (Tucker, Joseph) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Alegis Group, LLC, Corporate Parent Resurgent Holdings, LLC for Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. by Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.. (Tucker, Joseph) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph N. Tucker on behalf of Resurgent Capital Services, L.P., Resurgent Receivables, LLC (Tucker, Joseph) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent TransUnion Intermediate Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent TransUnion, Other Affiliate T. Rowe Price Group, Inc. for Trans Union, LLC. by Trans Union, LLC. (Jansen, Sandra) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by William Jacob Culbertson (Lawson, James) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • Docket(#4) TEXT ORDER by Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr. on 7/14/21: This action is hereby REFERRED to the Honorable H. BRENT BRENNENSTUHL, United States Magistrate Judge, for determination of non-dispositive matters pursuant to Title 28, U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Said Magistrate is empowered to conduct any hearings necessary for their resolution. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached.cc: Counsel (DJT) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERK'S NOTICE OF REMOVAL LETTER sent to Ohio Circuit Court re #1 Notice of Removal. (DJT) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Senior Judge Joseph H. McKinley, Jr.. (DJT) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL [NO ANSWER FILED] by Trans Union, LLC from Ohio Circuit Court, case number 21-CI-00175. Filing fee $ 402; receipt number 0644-3381087, filed by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-Summons To Trans Union, LLC, #3 Exhibit B-Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit C-Complaint To Trans Union, LLC, #5 Exhibit D-Equifax Information Services, LLC's Consent To Removal, #6 Exhibit E-GLA Collection Co., Inc.'s Consent To Removal, #7 Exhibit F-Resurgent Capital Services, L.P.'s Consent To Removal, #8 Exhibit G-Resurgent Receivables, LLC's Consent To Removal) (DJT) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESURGENT RECEIVABLES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where G.L.A. Collection Company, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RESURGENT CAPITAL SERVICES L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where OAK DBA THE STERLING is a litigant