This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/20/2020 at 09:40:48 (UTC).

Culbertson et al v. Deloitte Consulting LLP

Case Summary

On 05/21/2020 Culbertson filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Deloitte Consulting LLP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03962

  • Filing Date:

    05/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Timothy Sylvester

Paul Culbertson

William Gibson

Daniel Bozin

Nicole Hornbeck

Alexander Cabot

Alexandria Polichena

Bernadette Nolen

Timothy Smith

Kelly Allison-Pickering

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Kathy Neal

Janet M. Burns

Melissa Alexander

Defendant

Deloitte Consulting LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amanda Peterson

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan

90 Broad Street, Suite 1011

New York, NY 10004

Tiffany M. Yiatras

Attorney at Consumer Protection Legal, LLC

308 Hutchinson Road

Ellisville, MO 63011-2029

John A. Yanchunis

Attorney at Morgan & Morgan, P.A.

201 N. Franklin Street 7Th Floor

Tampa, FL 33602

Gary E. Mason

Attorney at Mason Lietz & Klinger LLP

5101 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Suite 305

Washington, DC 20016

Jeffrey Scott Goldenberg

Attorney at Goldenberg Schneider LPA

4445 Lake Forest Drive, Suite 490

Cincinnati, OH 45242

Charles E. Schaffer

Attorney at Levin, Fishbein, Sedran & Berman

510 Walnut Street - Suite 500

Philadelphia, PA 19106

Joseph Michael Lyon

Attorney at The Lyon Firm

2754 Erie Avenue

Cincinnati, OH 45208

Brian D. Flick

Attorney at DannLaw

P.O. Box 6031040

Cleveland, OH 44103

Javier Luis Merino

Attorney at The Dann Law Firm Co. LPA

372 Kinderkamack Road, Suite 5

Westwood, NJ 07675

Marc E. Dann

Attorney at DannLaw

P.O. Box 6031040

Cleveland, OH 44103

Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices, P.C.

77 West Washington Street, Suite 1220

Chicago, IL 60602

Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Kyle Alan Shamberg

Attorney at Weitz & Luxenberg, P.C.

700 Broadway

New York, NY 10003

David A. Straite

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer, LLP

850 Third Avenue

New York, NY 10022

Laurence David King

Attorney at Kaplan Fox & Kilsheimer LLP

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1560

Oakland, CA 94612

Matthew Ryan Wilon

Attorney at Meyer Wilson Co., Lpa

1320 Dublin Road, Suite 100

Columbus, OH 43215

Michael Joseph Boyle, Jr.

Attorney at Meyer Wilson Co., LPA

1320 Dublin Road, Suite 100

Columbus, OH 43215

Katherine Aizpuru

Attorney at Tycko & Zavareei LLP

1828 L Street N.W., Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Adler

Attorney at King & Spalding

1180 Peachtree Street, Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30309

Phyllis Buchen Sumner

Attorney at King & Spalding, LLP (GA)

1180 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30309

Alvin Young Lee

Attorney at King & Spalding LLP

1185 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

3 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

57 #4

Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Tiffany Marko

57 #3

Exhibit B - Illinois Good Standing Certificate of Illinois

57 #2

Exhibit A - Missouri Good Standing Certificate of Tiffany Marko Yiatras

57 #1

Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Tiffany Marko Yiatras to Appear Pro

#57

56 #4

Text of Proposed Order

56 #3

Certificate of Good Standing

56 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

56 #1

Affidavit

#56

#55

#52

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

105 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) ORDER granting #56 Motion for Joseph M. Lyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM) (Entered: 07/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) MOTION for Tiffany Marko Yiatras to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20748227. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paul Culbertson, William Gibson, Timothy Sylvester. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Tiffany Marko Yiatras to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Missouri Good Standing Certificate of Tiffany Marko Yiatras, #3 Exhibit B - Illinois Good Standing Certificate of Illinois, #4 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Tiffany Marko Yiatras to Appear Pro Hac Vice).(Yiatras, Tiffany) (Entered: 07/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #56 MOTION for Joseph M. Lyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) MOTION for Joseph M. Lyon to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Paul Culbertson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Lyon, Joseph) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Javier Luis Merino on behalf of Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith..(Merino, Javier) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Marc Edward Dann on behalf of Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith..(Dann, Marc) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER granting #52 Motion for Marc Edward Dann to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #52 MOTION for Marc Edward Dann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20682753. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MOTION for Marc Edward Dann to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-20682753. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Daniel Bozin, Nicole Hornbeck, Bernadette Nolen, Alexandria Polichena, Timothy Smith. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Marc E. Dann, #2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Exhibit B-Letter of Explanation, #4 Text of Proposed Order).(Dann, Marc) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ORDER granting #49 Motion for Matthew R. Wilson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
60 More Docket Entries
  • 05/22/2020
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Amanda Peterson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,000,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to none; no dollar demand entered on civil cover sheet; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pne) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 05/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Timothy Sylvester..(Peterson, Amanda) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by William Gibson..(Peterson, Amanda) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Paul Culbertson..(Peterson, Amanda) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Deloitte Consulting LLP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Paul Culbertson, William Gibson, Timothy Sylvester..(Peterson, Amanda) Modified on 5/22/2020 (pne). (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Peterson, Amanda) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Deloitte Consulting LLP. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19935418)Document filed by Paul Culbertson, Timothy Sylvester, William Gibson..(Peterson, Amanda) (Entered: 05/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deloitte Consulting LLP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Straite

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle Alan Shamberg

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laurence David King Esquire