This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/09/2022 at 08:57:53 (UTC).

Tracy Cui v. Snow Joe, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 Tracy Cui filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Snow Joe, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Sheri Pym. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06515

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tracy Cui

Defendants and Cross Claimants

Snow Joe, LLC

Home Depot, Inc.

Does 1 through 50 inclusive

Cross Defendants

Zhejiang YAT Electrical Appliance Co., Ltd

Does 1 through 10, inclusive (as to Cross-Complaint Doc No. 21 filed

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrew T Ryan

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Brian Takeya Yasuzawa

Barry R. Schirm

Robert Kenneth Dixon

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) Receipt of remand letter from Los Angeles Superior Court (twdb) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#29

(#29) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#28

(#28) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS GRANTING STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr re: Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court #27 . Case remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number 21STCV18257. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See minute order for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

27 #1

Proposed Order Remanding the Case to State Court Based on the Stipulation of the

#27

(#27) STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Snow Joe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Remanding the Case to State Court Based on the Stipulation of the Parties)(Schirm, Barry) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

25 #1

Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney

#25

(#25) REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Barry R. Schirm in place of attorney Robert K. Dixon filed by Defendant Home Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Attorney Barry R. Schirm added to party Home Depot, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Schirm, Barry) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#24

(#24) ORDER RE DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S MOTION FOR JOINDER OF AN ADDITIONAL CROSS-DEFENDANT ZHEJIANG YAT ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO., LTD. by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: This Court hereby GRANTS Defendant and Cross-Complainant Snow Joe, LLC's unopposed Motion for Joinder of an Additional Defendant, Zhejiang YAT Electrical Appliance Co., Ltd. (YAT) #20 . YAT is now a cross-defendant to this action. (gk) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

20 #20

Main Document

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Declaration of Brian Yasuzawa In Support of Snow Joe, LLC's Notice of Remov

1 #1

Main Document

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Receipt of remand letter from Los Angeles Superior Court (twdb) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court. (mrgo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS GRANTING STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE TO STATE COURT by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr re: Stipulation to Remand Case to State Court #27 . Case remanded to Los Angeles County Superior Court, Case number 21STCV18257. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (See minute order for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Defendant Snow Joe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Remanding the Case to State Court Based on the Stipulation of the Parties)(Schirm, Barry) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr re: REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Barry R. Schirm in place of attorney Robert K. Dixon #25 . The Court has received a request for substitution of counsel Dkt. No. 25. Counsel seeking to substitute into the case must resubmit the proposed order stating that counsel is sufficiently familiar with the case to be able to declare that counsel is ready and able to complete the case pursuant to the current deadlines. (See Local R. 83-2.3.5.) Otherwise, counsel must file a formal substitution motion forthwith. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 11/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Barry R. Schirm in place of attorney Robert K. Dixon filed by Defendant Home Depot, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order on Request for Approval of Substitution or Withdrawal of Attorney) (Attorney Barry R. Schirm added to party Home Depot, Inc.(pty:dft)) (Schirm, Barry) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER RE DEFENDANT AND CROSS-COMPLAINANT'S MOTION FOR JOINDER OF AN ADDITIONAL CROSS-DEFENDANT ZHEJIANG YAT ELECTRICAL APPLIANCE CO., LTD. by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: This Court hereby GRANTS Defendant and Cross-Complainant Snow Joe, LLC's unopposed Motion for Joinder of an Additional Defendant, Zhejiang YAT Electrical Appliance Co., Ltd. (YAT) #20 . YAT is now a cross-defendant to this action. (gk) (Entered: 10/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Crossclaim #21 . The following error(s) was/were found: It appears that this "Cross-Complaint" should have been lodged with the Motion for Joinder of an Additional Defendant Zhejiang Yat Electrical Appliance Co., Ltd., see document number 20. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Join in Complaint - (Discovery) Of An Additional Defendant Zhejiang YAT Electrical Appliance Co., Ltd #20 . The Court reschedules the hearing on said Motion from 11/2/2021 to 11/12/2021 at 08:30 AM for an in-person hearing before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr.. Counsel is directed to review the Court's Standing Order and check the Court's motion schedule prior to setting a motion hearing.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vcr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) CROSSCLAIM against Cross-Defendant Zhejiang YAT Electrical Appliance Co., Ltd, filed by De Snow Joe, LLC.(Yasuzawa, Brian) (Entered: 10/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Snow Joe, LLC. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 6/25/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Home Depot, Inc., Snow Joe, LLC. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Tracy Cui. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 5/14/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Barry R. Schirm counsel for Defendant Snow Joe, LLC. Adding Barry R. Schirm as counsel of record for Snow Joe, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Snow Joe, LLC. (Attorney Barry R. Schirm added to party Snow Joe, LLC(pty:dft))(Schirm, Barry) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Brian Takeya Yasuzawa counsel for Defendant Snow Joe, LLC. Adding Brian Yasuzawa as counsel of record for Snow Joe, LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Snow Joe, LLC. (Yasuzawa, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Snow Joe, LLC, (Yasuzawa, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Snow Joe, LLC. (Yasuzawa, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 21STCV18257 Receipt No: ACACDC-31794241 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendant Snow Joe, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Yasuzawa In Support of Snow Joe, LLC's Notice of Removal) (Attorney Brian Takeya Yasuzawa added to party Snow Joe, LLC(pty:dft))(Yasuzawa, Brian) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less