This case was last updated from PACER on 09/20/2019 07:40:22

Get the Latest Court Record Available:

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 a Prisoner - Civil Right case was filed by Cuello against Miller in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District.

Case Details

  • Case Number 8:19-CV-00320
  • Filing Date 07/22/2019
  • Case Status Pending - Other Pending
  • Case Type Prisoner - Civil Right
  • Jurisdiction U.S. District Courts
  • Judge Pro Se Docket
  • Courthouse Nebraska District

Party Details

  • Defendant Paul Gordon
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Plaintiff Luke Cuello
  • Represented By
    • Self Represented
  • Defendant Kane Ramsey
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant John P. Rademacher
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Chad Hunt
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Michael Mefford
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Sean Eatherton
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented
  • Defendant Neil Miller
  • Represented By
    • Unrepresented

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : Plaintiff will have 30 days to s...

Free with Subscription
#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff's Motion for Le...

Free with Subscription
#7

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#3

RESTRICTED

Fees Apply
#6

(#6) LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account st...

Fees Apply
#5

(#5) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides ...

Fees Apply
#4

(#4) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint file...

Fees Apply
#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf...

Fees Apply
#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Sean Eatherton, Paul Gordon, Chad Hun...

Fees Apply

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : Plaintiff will have 30 days to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to pay the initial partial filing fee. In the absence of cause shown, this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. The clerk of the court is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: October 15, 2019: check for response to show cause order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (ADB) (Entered: 09/13/2019)
  • 08/12/2019
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER that the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (Filing No. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.13 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: September 11, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiffs claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC) (Entered: 08/12/2019)
  • 08/05/2019
  • (#7) PRISONER ACCOUNT CERTIFICATE by Plaintiff Luke Cuello. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LAC) (Entered: 08/05/2019)
  • 07/23/2019
  • (#6) LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. (LAC) (Entered: 07/23/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#5) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Senior Judge Laurie Smith Camp. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(LAC) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#4) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LAC) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#3) PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Luke Cuello ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LAC) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Luke Cuello.(LAC) (Entered: 07/22/2019)
  • 07/22/2019
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Sean Eatherton, Paul Gordon, Chad Hunt, Michael Mefford, Neil Miller, John P. Rademacher, Kane Ramsey filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Luke Cuello. (LAC) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.