This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/19/2022 at 08:44:24 (UTC).

Cucuzza v. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 Cucuzza filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James Lawrence King and Melissa Damian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-24411

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Lawrence King

Referral Judge

Melissa Damian

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen Cucuzza

Defendants

Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston

Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cesar Gavidia, Jr.

Attorney at Dell & Schaefer

2404 Hollywood Boulevard

Hollywood, FL 33020

Defendant Attorney

Lee Warren Marcus

Attorney at MARCUS & MYERS PA

6150 Metrowest Blvd, Suite 208

Orlando, FL 32835

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (cds) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Stephen Cucuzza. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 1/11/2022, response/answer due 2/1/2022. (Gavidia, Cesar) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

#5

(#5) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Attorney Lee Warren Marcus added to party Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston(pty:dft). (Marcus, Lee) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

#6

(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 1/4/2023., Motions due by 1/9/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/3/2023., Calendar Call set for 5/4/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Bench Trial set for 5/8/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 2/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 1/4/2023., Motions due by 1/9/2023., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/3/2023., Calendar Call set for 5/4/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2023 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Bench Trial set for 5/8/2023 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Melissa Damian for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 2/2/2022. See attached document for full details. (jw) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Attorney Lee Warren Marcus added to party Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston(pty:dft). (Marcus, Lee) (Entered: 02/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Stephen Cucuzza. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 1/11/2022, response/answer due 2/1/2022. (Gavidia, Cesar) (Entered: 01/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (cds) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston f/k/a Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15264672, filed by Stephen Cucuzza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Gavidia, Cesar) (Entered: 12/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIBERTY LIFE ASSURANCE COMPANY OF BOSTON is a litigant

Latest cases where Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Cesar Gavidia, Jr.