This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/17/2020 at 09:50:22 (UTC).

Cub Club Investment, LLC v. Apple, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Cub Club Investment, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Apple, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00856

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cub Club Investment, LLC

Defendant

Apple, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Allen Yates

Attorney at Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

24 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77046

Barden Todd Patterson

Attorney at Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

24 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77046-2472

Abelino Reyna

Attorney at Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

900 Washington Ave., Suite 503

Waco, TX 76701

Kyrie Kimber Cameron

Attorney at Patterson & Sheridan, LLP

24 Greenway Plaza, Suite 1600

Houston, TX 77046-2472

Defendant Attorneys

Gabriel Simeone Gross

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

140 Scott Drive

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Sameer Hashmi

Attorney at Scott Douglas and McConnico LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Paige Arnette Amstutz

Attorney at Scott, Douglass & McConnico, LLP

303 Colorado Street, Suite 2400

Austin, TX 78701

Carolyn Homer

Attorney at Latham & Watkins LLP

555 Eleventh Street, Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20004

Andrew Gass

Attorney at Latham & Watkins, LLP

505 Montgomery Street, Suite 2000

San Francisco, CA 94111

 

Court Documents

19 #1

Proposed Order

#19

18 #1

Proposed Order

#18

#17

#16

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

#13

#6

#5

4 #1

AO-120

#4

#3

#2

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paige Arnette Amstutz for Elana N. Dawson ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-14185962) by on behalf of Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Apple, Inc. answer due 11/25/2020. (lad) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Defendant Apple Inc. shall have up to and including November 25, 2020 to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jhg) (Entered: 11/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Second Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Apple, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paige Arnette Amstutz on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Attorney Paige Arnette Amstutz added to party Apple, Inc.(pty:dft) (Amstutz, Paige) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sameer Hashmi on behalf of Apple, Inc.. Attorney Sameer Hashmi added to party Apple, Inc.(pty:dft) (Hashmi, Sameer) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Apple, Inc. answer due 11/11/2020. (am) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. The Court, having reviewed the Motion, finds it should be GRANTED and therefore orders as follows: IT IS ORDERED the Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applicant, if he/she has not already done so, shall immediately tender the amount of $100.00, made payable to: Clerk, U.S. District Court, in compliance with Local Rule AT-I (f)(2). Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Defendant Apple Inc. shall have up to and including November 11, 2020 to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (kg) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Report on Copyright sent to Register of Copyrights. (lad) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (lad) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Abelino Reyna on behalf of Cub Club Investment, LLC (Reyna, Abelino) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Allen Yates on behalf of Cub Club Investment, LLC (Yates, John) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyrie Kimber Cameron on behalf of Cub Club Investment, LLC (Cameron, Kyrie) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ***Entered in error by Clerk's Office*** (lad) Modified on 9/21/2020 (lad). (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Cub Club Investment, LLC. (Patterson, Barden) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Cub Club Investment, LLC. (Patterson, Barden) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-13983522), filed by Cub Club Investment, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Patterson, Barden) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Apple Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abelino Reyna

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Barden Todd Patterson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyrie Kimber Cameron