This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/09/2023 at 06:00:57 (UTC).

CTD Networks, LLC v. AT&T Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2022 CTD Networks, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against AT T Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-01038

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CTD Networks, LLC

Defendant

AT&T Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CTD Networks, LLC (Ramey, William) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

12 #1

Proposed Order

12 #12

Main Document

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas M. Mathews on behalf of AT&T Inc.. Attorney Nicholas M. Mathews added to party AT&T Inc.(pty:dft) (Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

10 #1

Proposed Order

10 #10

Main Document

9 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

7 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CTD Networks, LLC. AT&T Inc. served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by CTD Networks, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by CTD Networks, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A-H

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CTD Networks, LLC (Ramey, William) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketCase Stayed (sm3) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #12 Motion to Stay Case entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The parties have informed the Court that they have reached a settlement in principle and are working towards finalizing written settlement documents. To ensure that this cause does not remain on the Court's docket in the absence of a live controversy, the Court vacates all remaining deadlines and settings, and ORDERS the parties to submit a stipulation of dismissal or an agreed judgment and any appropriate supporting documents on or before February 22, 2023. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41. Should the parties be unable to finalize the settlement and submit appropriate documents by that date, they must request an extension of time to do so. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION to Stay Case and Notice of Resolution by AT&T Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #9 Motion to Substitute entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. It is hereby ORDERED that AT&T Inc is DISMISSED from this action and AT&TServices, Inc. shall be SUBSTITUTED as the defendant in the First Amended Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb) (Entered: 01/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: AT&T Inc. answer due 1/17/2023. (sm3) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Defendant AT&T, Inc. to move, answer, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to January 17, 2023.(This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicholas M. Mathews on behalf of AT&T Inc.. Attorney Nicholas M. Mathews added to party AT&T Inc.(pty:dft) (Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #8 Amended Complaint by AT&T Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mathews, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: AT&T Inc. answer due 12/30/2022. (lad) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketText Order GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. The deadline for Defendant AT&T, Inc. to move, answer,or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to December 30, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cb) (Entered: 10/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by CTD Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CTD Networks, LLC. AT&T Inc. served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to AT&T Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 10/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Parties by CTD Networks, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by CTD Networks, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXWDC-16606095), filed by CTD Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-H, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 10/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less