This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/09/2020 at 07:14:58 (UTC).

CSE Entertainment, Ltd. v. Axtion Technologies LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/10/2020 CSE Entertainment, Ltd filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Axtion Technologies LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew F. Kennelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03408

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew F. Kennelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CSE Entertainment, Ltd.

Defendants

Axtion Technologies LLC

Edwin Joseph Kasanders

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Edward Urbanczyk

Attorney at AU LLC

564 W. Randolph St. 2Nd Floor

Chicago, IL 60661

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Demuri Haeberle

Attorney at Patterson Law Firm

200 W. Monroe Street, Suite 2025

Chicago, IL 60606

Sarah Kathleen Dunkley

Attorney at Patterson Law Firm

200 W. Monroe Street, Suite 2025

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case is set for a status hearing on 8/18/2020 at 9:50 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. By no later than 8/11/2020, the parties are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (2) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (3) their views on how the motion for preliminary injunction should be briefed and heard; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. (mk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

#15

(#15) DECLARATION of Adam E. Urbanczyk regarding motion for preliminary injunction #12 (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

14 #7

Exhibit G

14 #6

Exhibit F

14 #5

Exhibit E

14 #4

Exhibit D

14 #3

Exhibit C

14 #2

Exhibit B

14 #1

Exhibit A

#14

(#14) DECLARATION of Juha Kauppinen regarding motion for preliminary injunction #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

13 #1

Errata Unreported Opinions

#13

(#13) MEMORANDUM by CSE Entertainment, Ltd. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #12 (Attachments: #1 Errata Unreported Opinions)(Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#12

(#12) MOTION by Plaintiff CSE Entertainment, Ltd. for preliminary injunction (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

#11

(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer #10 is granted; answer to complaint is to be filed by 8/17/2020. (mk) (Entered: 07/18/2020)

10 #1

Notice of Filing

#10

(#10) MOTION by Defendants Axtion Technologies LLC, Edwin Joseph Kasanders for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Dunkley, Sarah) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: This case is set for a status hearing on 8/18/2020 at 9:50 AM, using call-in number 888-684-8852, access code 746-1053. Counsel should wait for the case to be called before announcing themselves. By no later than 8/11/2020, the parties are to file a joint status report that includes the following information: (1) a description of each party's claims and defenses; (2) details regarding any discussions concerning settlement, whether before or after the filing of the lawsuit; (3) their views on how the motion for preliminary injunction should be briefed and heard; (4) a proposed discovery and pretrial schedule; and (5) any other matters that any party wishes to bring to the Court's attention. (mk) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DECLARATION of Adam E. Urbanczyk regarding motion for preliminary injunction #12 (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION of Juha Kauppinen regarding motion for preliminary injunction #12 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MEMORANDUM by CSE Entertainment, Ltd. in support of motion for preliminary injunction #12 (Attachments: #1 Errata Unreported Opinions)(Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION by Plaintiff CSE Entertainment, Ltd. for preliminary injunction (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly: Defendants' motion for extension of time to answer #10 is granted; answer to complaint is to be filed by 8/17/2020. (mk) (Entered: 07/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION by Defendants Axtion Technologies LLC, Edwin Joseph Kasanders for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, #1 (unopposed) (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing)(Dunkley, Sarah) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Axtion Technologies LLC, Edwin Joseph Kasanders by Sarah Kathleen Dunkley (Dunkley, Sarah) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Axtion Technologies LLC, Edwin Joseph Kasanders by Michael Demuri Haeberle (Haeberle, Michael) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk10, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CSE Entertainment, Ltd. as to Axtion Technologies LLC on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 07/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by CSE Entertainment, Ltd. as to Edwin Joseph Kasanders on 6/26/2020, answer due 7/17/2020. (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Axtion Technologies LLC, Edwin Joseph Kasanders. (ng, ) (Entered: 06/12/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Matthew F. Kennelly. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (sxh, ) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 06/11/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff CSE Entertainment, Ltd. by Adam Edward Urbanczyk (Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by CSE Entertainment, Ltd.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17098531. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Urbanczyk, Adam) (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less