This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/25/2021 at 07:47:44 (UTC).

CSAA Insurance Exchange v. One World Technologies, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 CSAA Insurance Exchange filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against One World Technologies, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Morrison C. England, Jr and Deborah Barnes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01532

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Morrison C. England, Jr

Referral Judge

Deborah Barnes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CSAA Insurance Exchange

Defendants

One World Technologies, Inc.

Home Depot USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert E. Wall

Attorney at The Grunsky Law Firm, PC

240 Westgate Drive

Watsonville, CA 95076

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey R Williams

Attorney at Rile Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP

456 Montgomery Street16Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Andrew Emilio Calderon

Attorney at Riley Safer Holmes & Cancila LLP

100 Spectrum Center Drivesuite 440

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Consent Form

1 #6

Notice of Interested Parties

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Consent Form

2 #2

VDRP

#3

#4

#5

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) [DISREGARD COUNSEL COOPER NOT ADMITTED] ASSOCIATION of ATTORNEY: adding Burleigh E. Cooper (Wall, Robert) Modified on 9/23/2021 (Benson, A.). (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER with Jury Demand by Home Depot USA Inc., One World Technologies, Inc. (Williams, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Home Depot USA Inc., One World Technologies, Inc. re #2 Civil New Case Documents for MCE. (Calderon, Andrew) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kaminski, H) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, case number 34-2021-00304477 by Defendants. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9785898) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Consent Form, #6 Notice of Interested Parties)(Calderon, Andrew) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSAA Insurance Exchange is a litigant

Latest cases where ONE WORLD TECHNOLOGIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey R. Williams Esq.