This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2021 at 09:32:21 (UTC).

CSAA Affinity Insurance Company v. Amerigas Propane LP et al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 CSAA Affinity Insurance Company filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against Amerigas Propane LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is G Murray Snow. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-08041

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

G Murray Snow

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CSAA Affinity Insurance Company

Defendants

Amerigas Propane GP LLC

Unknown Parties

New Amerigas Propane Incorporated a foreign corporation doing business as Graves Propane

Amerigas Propane LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas Michael Schumacher

Attorney at Douglas M Schumacher PC

12625 N Saguaro Blvd., Ste. 115

Fountain Hills, AZ 85268

Defendant Attorneys

Ethan G Gibson

Attorney at Gibson Wunder

4 Houston Ctr., 1221 Lamar St.

Houston, TX 77010

Keith Alan Olbricht

Attorney at Burch & Cracchiolo PA

1850 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Gregory Alan Rosenthal

Attorney at Burch & Cracchiolo PA

1850 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85004

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Exhibit 1

#10

8 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Vincent Kasarskis

#8

#7

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order

6 #1

Exhibit 1

#6

#5

#3

2 #2

Corporate Disclosure Statement

2 #1

Corporate Disclosure Statement

#2

1 #3

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re: #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Amerigas Propane GP LLC, Amerigas Propane LP, New Amerigas Propane Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Olbricht, Keith) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #8 Response to Motion filed by CSAA Affinity Insurance Company. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MHW) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RESPONSE to Motion re: #6 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by CSAA Affinity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Vincent Kasarskis)(Schumacher, Douglas) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal and Affirmative Defenses by Amerigas Propane GP LLC, Amerigas Propane LP, New Amerigas Propane Incorporated.(Olbricht, Keith) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Amerigas Propane GP LLC, Amerigas Propane LP, New Amerigas Propane Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Olbricht, Keith) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketRemark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Ethan G Gibson on behalf of Defendants Amerigas Propane GP LLC, Amerigas Propane LP, New Amerigas Propane Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 4 Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Civil Cover Sheet by Defendants Amerigas Propane GP LLC, Amerigas Propane LP, New Amerigas Propane Incorporated. (Rosenthal, Gregory) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by Amerigas Propane LP, New Amerigas Propane Incorporated, Amerigas Propane GP LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile the Civil Cover Sheet, using the correct format. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAC) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-19196200. This case has been assigned to the Honorable G Murray Snow. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-08041-PCT-GMS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAC) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • Docket***STATE COURT RECORDS RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration on 1/25/21 upon Amerigas Propane LP; Amerigas Propane GP; New Amerigas Propane Incorporated. (BAC) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amerigas Propane GP LLC, Amerigas Propane LP, New Amerigas Propane Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(BAC) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Navajo County Superior Court, case number S0900-CV-202100002. Filing fee received: $402.00, receipt number 0970-19196200 filed by New Amerigas Propane Incorporated, Amerigas Propane LP, Amerigas Propane GP LLC. (Rosenthal, Gregory) (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A and B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(BAC) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CSAA AFFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERIGAS PROPANE LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Douglas Michael Schumacher(Designation Retained)