This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2021 at 09:09:37 (UTC).

Crystal Lagoons US Corp et al v. Pacific Aquascape International

Case Summary

On 08/25/2021 Crystal Lagoons US Corp filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Pacific Aquascape International. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Dustin B. Pead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00507

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dustin B. Pead

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Crystal Lagoons US Corp

Crystal Lagoons Technologies

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Pacific Aquascape International

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Eric R. Chad

Attorney at MERCHANT & GOULD PC

150 S Fifth St Ste 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Glenn R. Bronson

Attorney at TRASKBRITT PC

230 S 500 E #300, Po Box 2550

Salt Lake City, UT 84110

James C. Watson

Attorney at TRASKBRITT PC

230 S 500 E #300, Po Box 2550

Salt Lake City, UT 84110

Anthony R. Zeuli

Attorney at MERCHANT & GOULD PC

150 S Fifth St Ste 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Karen Beckman

Attorney at MERCHANT & GOULD PC

150 S Fifth St Ste 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Peter Selness

Attorney at MERCHANT & GOULD PC

150 S Fifth St, Ste 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Alexis Keiko Juergens

Attorney at MASCHOFF BRENNAN

111 S Main Ste 600

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

Jared J. Braithwaite

Attorney at FOLEY & LARDNER

136 S Main St Ste 400

Salt Lake City, UT 84101

 

Court Documents

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#19

11 #2

Exhibit A. Pro Hac Vice Application

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admissions Pro Hac Vice (Peter S. Sel

#11

#3

2 #6

Exhibit D. Declaration of Cory M. Severson in Support of Cloward H20 LLCs Motion

2 #5

Exhibit C. U.S. Patent No. 8,753,520, titled: Localized disinfection system for

2 #4

Exhibit B. U.S. Patent No. 9,708,822, titled: Process to maintain large clean re

2 #3

Exhibit A. U.S. Patent No. 8,062,514 (the 514 Patent) titled: Structure to conta

2 #2

Appendix Index of Exhibits to Complaint

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiffs Crystal Lagoons Technologies, Crystal Lagoons US Corp, Defendant Pacific Aquascape International. Form due by 11/8/2021. (alf) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Pacific Aquascape International Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand And, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Pacific Aquascape International. Attorney Jared J. Braithwaite added to party Pacific Aquascape International(pty:dft)(Braithwaite, Jared) (Entered: 10/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Pacific Aquascape International as to Pacific Aquascape International Waiver sent on 9/30/2021, answer due 10/21/2021. (alf) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #2 Complaint,,, Acknowledgment filed by Pacific Aquascape International.Pacific Aquascape International served on 8/30/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (Braithwaite, Jared Modified on 9/30/2021 - will be refiled as a Waiver (alf). (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Peter Selness for Crystal Lagoons Technologies and Crystal Lagoons US Corp.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/16/21. (alf) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Anthony R. Zeuli for Crystal Lagoons Technologies and Crystal Lagoons US Corp.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/16/21. (alf) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #10 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Karen Beckman for Crystal Lagoons Technologies and Crystal Lagoons US Corp.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/16/21. (alf) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric R. Chad for Crystal Lagoons Technologies and Crystal Lagoons US Corp.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 9/16/21. (alf) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Amend/Correct #11 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Peter S. Selness , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4107720,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of cas filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Lagoons Technologies, Crystal Lagoons US Corp. (Watson, James) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Amend/Correct #10 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karen Beckman , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4107703,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case a filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Lagoons Technologies, Crystal Lagoons US Corp. (Watson, James) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Karen Beckman , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4107703,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Lagoons Technologies, Crystal Lagoons US Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admissions Pro Hac Vice (Karen Beckman), #2 Exhibit A. Pro Hac Vice Application)(Watson, James) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Eric R. Chad , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-4107687,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Lagoons Technologies, Crystal Lagoons US Corp. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion for Admissions Pro Hac Vice (Eric R. Chad), #2 Exhibit A. Pro Hac Vice Application)(Watson, James) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorneys Anthony R. Zeuli, Eric R. Chad, Peter S. Selness, and Karen L. Beckman for Plaintiffs Crystal Lagoons Technologies and Crystal Lagoons US Corp. (nmt) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Pacific Aquascape International. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (nmt) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within twenty-one (21) days after any defendant has been served or any defendant has appeared, unless any party is appearing pro se. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 8/26/21. (alf) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorneys Anthony R. Zeuli, Eric R. Chad, Karen L. Beckman and Peter Selness, for Plaintiffs Crystal Lagoons Technologies, Crystal Lagoons US Corp (alf) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (nmt) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Lagoons Technologies, Crystal Lagoons US Corp identifying Crystal Lagoons US Corp as Corporate Parent. (Watson, James) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number BUTDC-4093091) filed by Crystal Lagoons US Corp, Crystal Lagoons Technologies. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #3 Exhibit A. U.S. Patent No. 8,062,514 (the 514 Patent) titled: Structure to contain a large water body of at least 15,000 m3, #4 Exhibit B. U.S. Patent No. 9,708,822, titled: Process to maintain large clean recreational water bodies (the 822 Patent), #5 Exhibit C. U.S. Patent No. 8,753,520, titled: Localized disinfection system for large water bodies (the 520 Patent), #6 Exhibit D. Declaration of Cory M. Severson in Support of Cloward H20 LLCs Motion for Partial Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement of the 514 Patent) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Watson, James) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiffs Crystal Laggons U.S. Corp., Crystal Lagoons Technologies is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (nmt) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less