This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2022 at 08:38:40 (UTC).

Crystal Jackson v. Allied Interstate LLC

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Crystal Jackson filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Allied Interstate LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael W. Fitzgerald and Alicia G. Rosenberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01262

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judge

Alicia G. Rosenberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crystal Jackson

Defendant

Allied Interstate LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Paul Camarena

Attorney at North and Sedgwick Law LLC

500 South Clinton, Suite 132

Chicago, IL 60607

Farshid John Fakourfar

Attorney at Law Office of Farshid John Fakourfar

1500 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite 549

Manhattan Beach, CA 90266

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew O'Hair Stromquist

Attorney at Pilgrim Christakis LLP

321 North Clark Street 26Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654

Alan M Ritchie

Attorney at Pilgrim Christakis LLP

321 North Clark Street 26Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654

 

Court Documents

#28

No Description Available

#29

No Description Available

#30

(#30) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#31

(#31) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#32

(#32) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul Camarena. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#33

(#33) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Matthew O'Hair Stromquist. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#34

(#34) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alan M Ritchie counsel for Defendant Allied Interstate LLC. Adding Alan M. Ritchie as counsel of record for Defendant Allied Interstate LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Allied Interstate LLC. (Attorney Alan M Ritchie added to party Allied Interstate LLC(pty:dft))(Ritchie, Alan) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#35

(#35) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Allied Interstate LLC, identifying iQor US Inc.. (Ritchie, Alan) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

36 #36

Main Document

36 #1

Proposed Order

#37

(#37) ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Paul Camarena to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Crystal Jackson, designating Farshid Fakourfar as local counsel #36 . (iv) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

#38

(#38) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Allied Interstate LLC. upon Allied Interstate LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/30/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Allied Interstate LLC. (Ritchie, Alan) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Defendant Allied Interstate LLC. upon Allied Interstate LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 3/30/2022, answer due 5/31/2022. Waiver of Service signed by Allied Interstate LLC. (Ritchie, Alan) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald: Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Paul Camarena to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Crystal Jackson, designating Farshid Fakourfar as local counsel #36 . (iv) (Entered: 03/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Paul Camarena to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Crystal Jackson (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 3/8/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-32912860) filed by attorney for plaintiff Crystal Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Farshid John Fakourfar added to party Crystal Jackson(pty:pla)) (Fakourfar, Farshid) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketPHV FEE PAID for Non-Resident Attorney Paul Camarena Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Receipt No. ACACDC-32912860 for $500 pro hac vice fee. (Camarena, Paul) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Allied Interstate LLC, identifying iQor US Inc.. (Ritchie, Alan) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Alan M Ritchie counsel for Defendant Allied Interstate LLC. Adding Alan M. Ritchie as counsel of record for Defendant Allied Interstate LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Allied Interstate LLC. (Attorney Alan M Ritchie added to party Allied Interstate LLC(pty:dft))(Ritchie, Alan) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Matthew O'Hair Stromquist. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Paul Camarena. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (jtil) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Motion by Matthew O'Hair Stromquist for presentment of motion to dismiss/lack of jurisdiction #7 before Honorable Virginia M. Kendall on 5/3/2021 at 09:00 AM. (Stromquist, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(#7) MOTION by Defendant Allied Interstate LLC to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Brendan Lee in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Stromquist, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Initial status hearing set for 7/15/2021 at 9:00 a.m. which will proceed via Teleconference. Joint Status Report due by 7/12/2021. The parties are directed to Judge Kendall's web page found at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov for information about the Initial Status Report and for information regarding all standing orders for cases on Judge Kendall's docket. The parties shall follow all of the standing orders for Judge Kendall and all Local Rules which can be found at the same web page. For the Initial Status Report, the parties are to report on the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) if no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary (with specific dates) to get the case ready for trial; 3) whether the parties jointly consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge. At the Initial Status Hearing, the Parties shall be prepared to inform the Court about the extent of monetary damages in order for the Court to address the proportionality of discovery as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. Teleconference instructions are as follows: Prior to the conference call, Please click on this hyper link: https://teleconference.uc.att.com/ecm/?bp=4044432170&mac=2413900. Once you are on Judge Kendall's teleconference page, you are directed to join the conference as A GUEST. It is imperative that you ENTER YOUR NAME and click on the CALL ME option. Fill in your phone number (no hypens) and NAME. You are directed to use the CALL ME option because your name will appear for the Judge and the Court Reporter and they will better be able to discern who is speaking. If you do not have access to a computer Dial: (877)848-7030, the access code is: 2413900#. Given the increased volume of users that is anticipated, you are directed to mute your phone until your case is called. In spite of using the CALL ME option please also remember to SAY YOUR NAME EACH TIME YOU SPEAK so that the record of the proceedings is accurate. You are directed not to use the speaker phone function and to test the sound quality of your listening and speaking device in advance. If you experience an issue being heard or hearing, please log off and either call in or log back in.The Court prefers that you use the procedure that requires that the system calls your phone and you enter your name so that the Court and the Court reporter can see who is speaking during the hearing. Mailed notice (lk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Allied Interstate LLC (Stromquist, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Allied Interstate LLC by Matthew O'Hair Stromquist (Stromquist, Matthew) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(#3) First AMENDED complaint by Crystal Jackson against Allied Interstate LLC (Camarena, Paul) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 04/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Allied Interstate LLC. (lxk, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Virginia M. Kendall. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cl, ) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Camarena, Paul) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Crystal Jackson; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0752-18046034.(Camarena, Paul) [Transferred from Illinois Northern on 2/28/2022.] (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allied Interstate, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan Ritchie

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew O. Stromquist