Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 06/18/2021 at 14:29:25 (UTC).

Crystal Clear Codec, LLC v. LG Electronics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On April 19, 2021, Crystal Clear Codec, LLC (“Crystal Clear Codec” or “Plaintiff”), represented by Amir H. Alavi, Demetrios Anaipakos, Michael McBride of Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C. and Masood Anjom of AZA Law, filed an intellectual property lawsuit against LG Electronics, Inc. and LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. (collectively “LG” or “Defendants”) seeking declaratory relief and damages for allegedly infringing the technology relating to the audio coding standard owned by the Plaintiff. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Western District of Texas with Judge Alan D. Albright presiding. 

 

The Plaintiff filed this complaint for Defendants infringement of one or more claims of U.S. Patent Nos. 8,063,809 (“the ‘809 Patent”), entitled “Transient Signal Encoding Method and Device, Decoding Method and Device, and Processing System”, 9,161,038 (“the ‘038 Patent”), entitled “Method and Device for Encoding A High Frequency Signal, And Method and Device for Decoding a High Frequency Signal”, 9,361,904 (“the ‘904 Patent”), entitled “Method for Predicting Bandwidth Extension Frequency Band Signal, and Decoding Device”, 10,032,460 (“the ‘460 Patent”), entitled “Frequency Envelope Vector Quantization Method and Apparatus” 10,614,817 (“the ‘817 Patent”), entitled “Recovering High Frequency Band Signal of a Lost Frame in Media Bitstream According to Gain Gradient” and 10,339,945 (“the ‘945 Patent”), entitled “Coding/Decoding Method, Apparatus, and System for Audio Signal” (collectively, “Patents-in-Suit”) owned by the Plaintiff.

 

The Plaintiff alleged that “LG has directly infringed and continues to directly infringe the Patents-in-Suit by, for example, making, using, offering to sell, selling, and/or importing into the United States without authority, products, equipment, software, and/or services that practice one or more claims of each of the Patents-in-Suit, including without limitation LG’s mobile devices, and other devices with EVS codec capabilities compliant with the EVS Standard. The Patents-in-Suit are essential to the EVS Standard. The EVS codec in the LG EVS Products complies with the EVS Standard. Because LG’s EVS Products include hardware and/or software components supporting the EVS codec compliant with the EVS Standard, LG necessarily infringes the Patents in-Suit.”

 

The Plaintiff further alleged upon information and belief that “LG advertises the infringing products and services, publishes specifications and promotional literature encouraging customers to operate the accused products and services, creates and/or distributes user manuals for the accused products and services that provide instruction and/or encourage infringing use, and offers support and/or technical assistance to its customers that provide instructions on and/or encourage infringing use. LG encourages and facilitates its customers to infringe the Patents-in-Suit by, for example, instructing customers that purchase the LG EVS Products that such devices have voice calling capability, and by providing various indicators within those devices of the same.”

 

There are six claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff, one for the alleged direct infringement of one or more claims of each of the Patents-in-suit owned by the Plaintiff. 

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the court to pass an order for declaratory relief along with award of damages pursuant to 35 U.S.C. § 284 together with prejudgment and post-judgment interest and costs and expenses of the suit.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.







Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00375

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crystal Clear Codec, LLC

Defendants

LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.

LG Electronics, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Amir H. Alavi

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

2500 One Houston Center, 1221 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

Michael McBride

Attorney at Ahmad Zavitsanos Anaipakos Alavi & Mensing, PC

1221 Mckinney, Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Masood Anjom

Attorney at AZA Law

1221 Mckinney Suite 2500

Houston, TX 77010

Demetrios Anaipakos

Attorney at Ahmad, Zavitsanos, Anaipakos, Alavi & Mensing P.C.

2500 One Houston Center, 1221 Mckinney Street

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Crystal Clear Codec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

#10

(#10) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Crystal Clear Codec, LLC. (Anjom, Masood) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal Clear Codec, LLC. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Alavi, Amir) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael McBride on behalf of Crystal Clear Codec, LLC (McBride, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Masood Anjom on behalf of Crystal Clear Codec, LLC (Anjom, Masood) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amir H. Alavi on behalf of Crystal Clear Codec, LLC (Alavi, Amir) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#4

(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Scott Clark. (lad) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Crystal Clear Codec, LLC. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14712841), filed by Crystal Clear Codec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

5 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Standing Order regarding Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 06/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Crystal Clear Codec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Crystal Clear Codec, LLC. (Anjom, Masood) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Crystal Clear Codec, LLC. LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc. served on 4/20/2021, answer due 5/11/2021. (Alavi, Amir) (Entered: 04/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael McBride on behalf of Crystal Clear Codec, LLC (McBride, Michael) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Masood Anjom on behalf of Crystal Clear Codec, LLC (Anjom, Masood) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Amir H. Alavi on behalf of Crystal Clear Codec, LLC (Alavi, Amir) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to LG Electronics U.S.A., Inc.. (lad) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Pro Hac Vice Letter to Scott Clark. (lad) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall comply with the Standing Orders of Judge Alan D. Albright located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Crystal Clear Codec, LLC. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-14712841), filed by Crystal Clear Codec, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Anaipakos, Demetrios) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LG ELECTRONICS U.S.A., INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Masood Anjom

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Demetrios Anaipakos