This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2022 at 05:31:34 (UTC).

Crystal Chopin et al v. CVS Pharmacy, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/25/2022 Crystal Chopin filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against CVS Pharmacy, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise L. Cote. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-10023

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Crystal Chopin

James Patrick as Guardian Ad Litem of N.P., Minor

Defendant

CVS Pharmacy Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gerald Blaine Singleton

Attorney at Singleton Schreiber LLP

2945 Townsgate Road Suite 200

Westlake Village, CA 91361

Defendant Attorneys

Sarah E. Johnston

Attorney at Barnes and Thornburg LLP

2049 Century Park East Suite 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Kristen Lee Richer

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

2029 Century Park East, Ste 300

Los Angeles, CA 90067

 

Court Documents

29 #1

*Restricted*

29 #29

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#28

(#28) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 2) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3043, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of New York and assigned to Honorable Denise L. Cote. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 11/17/2022)

#27

(#27) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Chopin, James Patrick as Guardian Ad Litem of N.P., Minorto Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 25 (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#26

(#26) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Chopin, James Patrick as Guardian Ad Litem of N.P., Minorto Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 25 (Watts, Mikal) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 11/09/2022)

#23

No Description Available

#22

No Description Available

#24

No Description Available

21 #1

Proposed Order

21 #21

Main Document

#20

No Description Available

#19

No Description Available

18 #1

Proposed Order

18 #18

Main Document

#17

No Description Available

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2022
  • DocketNOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/ for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (vba) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vba) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vba) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:22-md-03043-DLC. (vba) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-md-03043-DLC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:22-cv-06407. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (Entered: 11/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO- 2) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 3043, transferring case to USDC, Southern District of New York and assigned to Honorable Denise L. Cote. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 11/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Chopin, James Patrick as Guardian Ad Litem of N.P., Minorto Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 25 (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Chopin, James Patrick as Guardian Ad Litem of N.P., Minorto Text Only Scheduling Notice,,, 25 (Watts, Mikal) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 11/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mikal C. Watts. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (sh) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PETITION for Appointment of Crystal Chopin as Guardian ad Litem for N.P. filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Chopin, Crystal Chopin, as Guardian Ad Litem of N.P., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Chopin, Crystal Chopin, as Guardian Ad Litem of N.P., Minor, identifying Crystal Chopin, N.P., Minor, CVS Pharmacy, Inc.. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Chopin, Crystal Chopin, as Guardian Ad Litem of N.P., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Chopin, Crystal Chopin, as Guardian Ad Litem of N.P., Minor. (Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-33944092 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Crystal Chopin, Crystal Chopin, as Guardian Ad Litem of N.P., Minor. (Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton added to party Crystal Chopin(pty:pla), Attorney Gerald Blaine Singleton added to party Crystal Chopin, as Guardian Ad Litem of N.P., Minor(pty:pla))(Singleton, Gerald) [Transferred from California Central on 11/25/2022.] (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CVS Pharmacy, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kristen Lee Richer

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sarah Elizabeth Johnston