This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/08/2022 at 10:35:20 (UTC).

Crystal Aircruises LLC v. Marana Aerospace Solutions Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2021 Crystal Aircruises LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Marana Aerospace Solutions Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is James A Soto. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00520

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James A Soto

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crystal Aircruises LLC

Defendants

Marana Aerospace Solutions Incorporated an Oregon Corporation doing business as Ascent Aviation Services

David Querio

Scott Butler

Bret Burnside

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Adam Colby Losey

Attorney at Losey PLLC

1420 Edgewater Dr.

Orlando, FL 32804

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) NOTICE re: Serving Defendants with Order by Crystal Aircruises LLC re: #7 Order . (Losey, Adam) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

9 #1

Exhibit A - Waiver of the Service of Summons

9 #9

Main Document

8 #1

Exhibit A

8 #8

Main Document

#7

(#7) ORDER: after all parties have been served and have answered the complaint, plaintiff(s) shall file a motion indicating that all defendants have filed answers such that the case is ready to proceed to the next step in the litigation. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants at the same time they serve the Summons and Complaint; if these have already been served on Defendants prior to Plaintiffs receiving this Order, Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on Defendants within 14 days of the filing date of this Order. (See attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 12/14/2021. (REM) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Crystal Aircruises LLC. (MYE) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

4 #3

Summons

4 #2

Summons

4 #1

Summons

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Bret Burnside, Scott Butler, Marana Aerospace Solutions Incorporated, David Querio. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 12/10/2021)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20148287. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-520-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

2 #3

Summons

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Crystal Aircruises LLC. (Losey, Adam) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MYE) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20148287 filed by Crystal Aircruises LLC. (Losey, Adam) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(MYE) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE re: Serving Defendants with Order by Crystal Aircruises LLC re: #7 Order . (Losey, Adam) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE re: Defendants' Waiver of the Service of Summons by Crystal Aircruises LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Waiver of the Service of Summons)(Losey, Adam) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Crystal Aircruises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Losey, Adam) (Entered: 12/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: after all parties have been served and have answered the complaint, plaintiff(s) shall file a motion indicating that all defendants have filed answers such that the case is ready to proceed to the next step in the litigation. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants at the same time they serve the Summons and Complaint; if these have already been served on Defendants prior to Plaintiffs receiving this Order, Plaintiffs shall serve this Order on Defendants within 14 days of the filing date of this Order. (See attached Order for complete details). Signed by Judge James A Soto on 12/14/2021. (REM) (Entered: 12/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Complaint filed by Crystal Aircruises LLC. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MYE) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Crystal Aircruises LLC. (MYE) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Bret Burnside, Scott Butler, Marana Aerospace Solutions Incorporated, David Querio. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MYE). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-20148287. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A Soto. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-520-TUC-JAS. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MYE) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Submitted by Crystal Aircruises LLC. (Losey, Adam) (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(MYE) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number 0970-20148287 filed by Crystal Aircruises LLC. (Losey, Adam) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(MYE) (Entered: 12/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Colby Losey