This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2019 at 07:59:36 (UTC).

CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC v. Sandine et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2019 CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Sandine. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Brian C. Buescher and Susan M. Bazis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00407

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Buescher

Referral Judge

Susan M. Bazis

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CRW Mechanical Consulting & Fabrication, LLC

500 Energy Plaza, 409 S. 17Th Street

Omaha, NE 68102

CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

AFS Fabribation, LLC

11240 Davenport Street

Omaha, NE 68154

Aaron Sandine

Omaha, NE 68154

AFS Fabrication, LLC

Aaron F. Sandine

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC

Counter Claimants and Defendants

AFS Fabrication, LLC

Aaron F. Sandine

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John J. Waters, Jr.

Attorney at FRASER, STRYKER LAW FIRM

409 South 17Th Street, Suite 500, Energy Plaza

Omaha, NE 68102

Robert W. Futhey

Attorney at FRASER, STRYKER LAW FIRM

409 South 17Th Street, Suite 500, Energy Plaza

Omaha, NE 68102

Katherine A. McNamara

Attorney at FRASER, STRYKER LAW FIRM

409 South 17Th Street, Suite 500, Energy Plaza

Omaha, NE 68102

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Raymond R. Aranza

Attorney at WALENTINE, O'TOOLE LAW FIRM

P.O. Box 540125

Omaha, NE 68154-0125

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

RESTRICTED

#27

#26

#24

#23

#17

RESTRICTED

#15

RESTRICTED

#13

10 #3

Exhibit 3

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

#1

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Defendant AFS Fabrication, LLC, Counter Claimant AFS Fabrication, LLC.(Aranza, Raymond) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 12/2/2019.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis. (TCL) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE of Related Case by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC (McNamara, Katherine) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • (#25) TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant AFS Fabrication, LLC. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(CS) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC regarding Complaint, #1 filed by CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC by Aaron F. Sandine (Aranza, Raymond) (Entered: 10/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Defendants' Motion to Remand (Filing #13 ) is denied. Plaintiff's Motion for Order of Immediate Attachment (Filing #8 ) is denied. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (LKO) (Entered: 10/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian C. Buescher regarding on MOTION for Order of Immediate Attachment #8 and MOTION to Remand #15 . Motion Hearing held on 10/10/19 in Omaha. Evidence by the Plaintiff and Defendant. Motion to Remand #15 is denied and Motion for Order of Immediate Attachment #8 is under advisement. Order forthcoming regarding both motions. Courtroom Deputy: Laura Coyle; Court Reporter: Rogene Schroder; Appearance for Plaintiffs: Katherine A. McNamara; Appearance for Defendant: Raymond R. Aranza; Time Start: 11:02 a.m.; Time Stop: 11:39 a.m.; Time in Courts: 37 minutes; (LAC) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) TEXT ORDER granting #19 Motion to Restrict pursuant to the E-Government Act. Access to Filing #15 and Filing #17 shall be restricted. Ordered by Judge Brian C. Buescher. (LAC) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) BRIEF in opposition to MOTION for Immediate Order of Attachment #8 by Attorney Raymond R. Aranza on behalf of Defendant Aaron F. Sandine.(Aranza, Raymond) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) INDEX in support of MOTION for Immediate Order of Attachment #8 by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(McNamara, Katherine) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) BRIEF in support of MOTION for Immediate Order of Attachment #8 by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC.(McNamara, Katherine) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Immediate Order of Attachment by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC.(McNamara, Katherine) (Entered: 10/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to defendant AFS Fabrication, LLC, Aaron F. Sandine. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (TCL) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct party names (SLP). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Futhey, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Requested as to regarding Complaint #1 . (Futhey, Robert) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Katherine A. McNamara on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC (McNamara, Katherine) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct party names (SLP). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • (#3) TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Susan M. Bazis assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (TCL) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of Plaintiff CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC.(Futhey, Robert) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct party names (SLP). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANEDC-4018459), by Attorney Robert W. Futhey on behalf of CRW Mechanical Consulting and Fabrication, LLC(Futhey, Robert) Modified on 9/18/2019 to correct party names (SLP). (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Raymond Ralph Aranza