This case was last updated from PACER on 10/15/2020 at 08:01:39 (UTC).

Cruz v. Superintendent of Sullivan Correctional Facility

Case Summary

On 08/16/2020 Cruz filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Superintendent of Sullivan Correctional Facility. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is LaShann DeArcy Hall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03722

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Nelson Cruz

Respondent

Superintendent of Sullivan Correctional Facility

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Justin C Bonus

Attorney at Law Office of Edmond R. Shinn, Esq., Ltd.

118-35 Queens Blvd., Suite 400

Forest Hills, NY 11375

Respondent Attorney

KINGS COUNTY DISTRICT ATTORNEYS OFFICE - GENERIC

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#2

(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E - July 31, 2020 Letter by Judge Simpson

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D - Judge Simpson Retirement Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C - Cruz Letter to Administrative Judges

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B - Minutes from August 29, 2019

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - Minutes from April 12, 2019

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filing fee $ 5, receipt number ANYEDC-13217346, filed by Nelson Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Minutes from April 12, 2019, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Minutes from August 29, 2019, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Cruz Letter to Administrative Judges, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Judge Simpson Retirement Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - July 31, 2020 Letter by Judge Simpson, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Bonus, Justin) (Entered: 08/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filing fee $ 5, receipt number ANYEDC-13217346, filed by Nelson Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Minutes from April 12, 2019, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Minutes from August 29, 2019, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Cruz Letter to Administrative Judges, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Judge Simpson Retirement Agreement, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - July 31, 2020 Letter by Judge Simpson, #6 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Bonus, Justin) (Entered: 08/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less