This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/22/2023 at 02:37:53 (UTC).

Cruz v. Benihana, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/13/2022 Cruz filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Benihana, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert M. Levy and Pamela K. Chen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05451

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

Presiding Judge

Pamela K. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Miriam Cruz

Defendant

Benihana, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Mars Khaimov

14749 71St Ave

Flushing, NY 11367

Defendant Attorney

Glenn Michael Rissman

Attorney at Stearns Weaver Miller Weissler Alhadeff & Sitterson, P.A.

200 East Las Olas Boulevard, Suite 2100

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miriam Cruz. Benihana, Inc. served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

#7

(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Benihana, Inc.. (Rissman, Glenn) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Miriam Cruz against Benihana, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15932129 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Miriam Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#5

(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16021672. by Benihana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Glenn M Rissman, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Rissman, Glenn) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

5 #1

Affidavit Affidavit of Glenn M Rissman

5 #2

Proposed Order Proposed Order

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for December 7, 2022 at 4:30 p.m., before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge at (888) 684-8852; Access Code #: 6223489. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 IC QUESTIONNAIRE, #2 INDIVIDUAL RULES) (JM) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

8 #1

IC QUESTIONNAIRE

8 #2

INDIVIDUAL RULES

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: An initial conference by telephone has been scheduled for December 7, 2022 at 4:30 p.m., before the Honorable Robert M. Levy, United States Magistrate Judge at (888) 684-8852; Access Code #: 6223489. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/1/2022. (Attachments: #1 IC QUESTIONNAIRE, #2 INDIVIDUAL RULES) (JM) (Entered: 11/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Benihana, Inc.. (Rissman, Glenn) (Entered: 10/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Miriam Cruz. Benihana, Inc. served on 10/10/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting #5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/11/2022. (AM) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-16021672. by Benihana, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Glenn M Rissman, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Rissman, Glenn) (Entered: 10/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Miriam Cruz against Benihana, Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15932129 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Miriam Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Khaimov, Mars) (Entered: 09/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less