This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/14/2020 at 08:56:32 (UTC).

Cruz Lopez v. SWR Unlimited Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 Cruz Lopez filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against SWR Unlimited Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Denis R. Hurley and Steven I. Locke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04961

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Denis R. Hurley

Referral Judge

Steven I. Locke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Luis Cruz Lopez

Defendants

Deborah Roberts

SWR Unlimited Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Katherine Yesenia Morales

Attorney at Katz Melinger PLLC

280 Madison Avenue, Suite 600

New York, NY 10016

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Cruz Lopez. SWR Unlimited Inc. served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

#9

(#9) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Luis Cruz Lopez (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Deborah Roberts. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to SWR Unlimited Inc. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#6

(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#5

(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. by Luis Cruz Lopez (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#3

(#3) Proposed Summons. by Luis Cruz Lopez (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Luis Cruz Lopez (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Deborah Roberts, SWR Unlimited Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13529731 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Luis Cruz Lopez. (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Luis Cruz Lopez. SWR Unlimited Inc. served on 10/26/2020, answer due 11/16/2020. (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT to become party in a collective action. by Luis Cruz Lopez (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued as to Deborah Roberts. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to SWR Unlimited Inc. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley and Magistrate Judge Steven I. Locke. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. by Luis Cruz Lopez (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. by Luis Cruz Lopez (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Luis Cruz Lopez (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Deborah Roberts, SWR Unlimited Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-13529731 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Luis Cruz Lopez. (Morales, Katherine) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine Yesenia Morales