Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 09/13/2020 at 22:32:17 (UTC).

CRUTHRIDS v. STATE OF MAINE

Case Summary

On 07/15/2020 CRUTHRIDS filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against STATE OF MAINE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN C. NIVISON and GEORGE Z. SINGAL. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00249

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN C. NIVISON

Presiding Judge

GEORGE Z. SINGAL

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CLEVELAND O CRUTHRIDS

Respondent

STATE OF MAINE

Not Classified By Court

MAINE ATTORNEY GENERAL - HABEAS CASES

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

HUNTER J. TZOVARRAS

Attorney at PELLETIER FAIRCLOTH & BRACCIO LLC

88 Hammond Street, Suite 321

Bangor, ME 04401

Respondent Attorney

DONALD W. MACOMBER

Attorney at OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL

626-8800

Augusta, ME 04333-0006

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by CLEVELAND O CRUTHRIDS Responses due by 9/17/2020. (TZOVARRAS, HUNTER) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit State Court Record

#3

(#3) ANSWER/RESPONSE/REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by STATE OF MAINE. Reply due by 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(MACOMBER, DONALD) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#2

(#2) ORDER TO ANSWER #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 9/21/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

1 #3

Order Denying Certificate of Probable Cause

1 #2

Decision and Order on Post-Conviction Review

1 #1

Maine Supreme Judicial Court Reporter of Decision

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CLEVELAND O CRUTHRIDS. (Attachments: #1 Maine Supreme Judicial Court Reporter of Decision, #2 Decision and Order on Post-Conviction Review, #3 Order Denying Certificate of Probable Cause) (jgd) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReset Deadlines as to #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus per Order No. 6: Reply due by 9/27/2020. (lrt) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of Section 2254 Petition. Time is extended to September 27, 2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File Response to Motion to Dismiss by CLEVELAND O CRUTHRIDS Responses due by 9/17/2020. (TZOVARRAS, HUNTER) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • Docket(#4) STATE COURT RECORD filed in paper. (mtm) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER/RESPONSE/REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by STATE OF MAINE. Reply due by 8/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Record)(MACOMBER, DONALD) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER TO ANSWER #1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses due by 9/21/2020. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (MFS) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Received from CLEVELAND O CRUTHRIDS: Amount Paid: $5.00. Receipt Number: 120000214. Method of Payment: Check. Purpose of Payment: Filing Fee. Date Paid: 7/17/2020 (mtm) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by CLEVELAND O CRUTHRIDS. (Attachments: #1 Maine Supreme Judicial Court Reporter of Decision, #2 Decision and Order on Post-Conviction Review, #3 Order Denying Certificate of Probable Cause) (jgd) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONALD W. MACOMBER