This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/20/2022 at 10:47:22 (UTC).

Cruse et al v. Block, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/21/2022 Cruse filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Block, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-06401

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Dale Cruse

Jernej Furman

Alex Proimos

Ben Schumin

Falco Ermert

Ivan Radic

Marco Verch

Nenad Stojkovic

Defendants

Block, Inc.

Square Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Evan A. Andersen

Attorney at SRIPLAW, P.A.

3372 Peachtree Road, Suite 115

Atlanta, GA 30326

Joel Benjamin Rothman

Attorney at Schneider Rothman Intellectual Property Law Group, PLLC

4651 North Federal Highway

Boca Raton, FL 33431

Jonah Adam Grossbardt

Attorney at Sriplaw

8730 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 350

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Matthew Laurence Rollin

Attorney at Sriplaw

8730 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 350

Beverly Hills, CA 90211

Defendant Attorneys

Daralyn J. Durie

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Joseph Charles Gratz

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Eugene Novikov

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

217 Leidesdorff Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

Robert Michael Paris

Attorney at Durie Tangri LLP

953 East 3Rd Street

Los Angeles, CA 90013

Holly Hawkins Saporito

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP - Atl

Suite 4900, 1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

Sarah Parker LaFantano

Attorney at Alston & Bird, LLP - Atl

1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309-3424

 

Court Documents

#67

(#67) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#66

(#66) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#65

(#65) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#64

(#64) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#63

(#63) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#62

(#62) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#61

(#61) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#60

(#60) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#59

(#59) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Hawkins Saporito on behalf of Block, Inc. (Saporito, Holly) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by Alex Proimos, Nenad Stojkovic, Dale Cruse, Jernej Furman, Falco Ermert, Ivan Radic, Ben Schumin, Marco Verch. Block, Inc. served on 5/4/2022, answer due 5/25/2022. (Andersen, Evan) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Steve C. Jones recused. Case reassigned to Judge Mark H. Cohen for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-CV-783-MHC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/25/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#5

(#5) AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (ddm) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Dale Cruse, Falco Ermert, Jernej Furman, Alex Proimos, Ivan Radic, Ben Schumin, Nenad Stojkovic, Marco Verch re #1 Complaint, of Filing an Action Regarding a Copyright (Andersen, Evan) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Block, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#2

(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Dale Cruse, Falco Ermert, Jernej Furman, Alex Proimos, Ivan Radic, Ben Schumin, Nenad Stojkovic and Marco Verch. (eop) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

109 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Andersen, Evan) (Filed on 12/13/2022) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dale Cruse, Falco Ermert, Jernej Furman, Alex Proimos, Ivan Radic, Ben Schumin, Nenad Stojkovic, Marco Verch (Grossbardt, Jonah) (Filed on 11/14/2022) (Entered: 11/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Parker LaFantano on behalf of Block, Inc. (LaFantano, Sarah) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Holly Hawkins Saporito on behalf of Block, Inc. (Saporito, Holly) (Entered: 05/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed by Alex Proimos, Nenad Stojkovic, Dale Cruse, Jernej Furman, Falco Ermert, Ivan Radic, Ben Schumin, Marco Verch. Block, Inc. served on 5/4/2022, answer due 5/25/2022. (Andersen, Evan) (Entered: 05/05/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Steve C. Jones recused. Case reassigned to Judge Mark H. Cohen for all further proceedings. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:22-CV-783-MHC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Steve C. Jones on 02/25/2022. (ddm) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (ddm) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Dale Cruse, Falco Ermert, Jernej Furman, Alex Proimos, Ivan Radic, Ben Schumin, Nenad Stojkovic, Marco Verch re #1 Complaint, of Filing an Action Regarding a Copyright (Andersen, Evan) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Block, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons by Dale Cruse, Falco Ermert, Jernej Furman, Alex Proimos, Ivan Radic, Ben Schumin, Nenad Stojkovic and Marco Verch. (eop) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketNotice of deficiency re AO Form 121. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 121. See LR 3.4. Docket the form using the event AO 121, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (eop) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Alex Proimos, Nenad Stojkovic, Dale Cruse, Jernej Furman, Falco Ermert, Ivan Radic, Ben Schumin and Marco Verch. (Filing fee $402.00, receipt number AGANDC-11613260) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Block and Company Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SQUARE D COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew Laurence Rollin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan A. Andersen