This case was last updated from PACER on 01/05/2020 at 08:14:08 (UTC).

Crump v. Metzger et al

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 Crump filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Metzger. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maryellen Noreika. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-02105

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Delaware District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maryellen Noreika

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Benjamin Crump

Smyrna, DE 19977

Respondents

Attorney General Kathleen Jennings

Dana Metzger

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Benjamin Crump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(amf) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#2

(#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Benjamin Crump.(amf) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

4 #1

Exhibits

1 #1

Petitioner's Motion to 3C

#1

(#1) ORDER from the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Petitioner's application for leave to file a second or successive 28 U.S.C. 2254 petition is GRANTED. SO ORDERED by Third Circuit Judges McKee, Shwartz, and Bibas on 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petitioner's Motion to 3C) (amf) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Maryellen Noreika. Please include the initials of the Judge (MN) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MEMORANDUM in Support re #2 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Benjamin Crump. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(amf) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (amf) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Benjamin Crump.(amf) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) ORDER from the United States Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit. Petitioner's application for leave to file a second or successive 28 U.S.C. 2254 petition is GRANTED. SO ORDERED by Third Circuit Judges McKee, Shwartz, and Bibas on 11/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Petitioner's Motion to 3C) (amf) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.