This case was last updated from PACER on 06/29/2020 at 18:04:40 (UTC).

Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company v. Advanced Property Preservation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 04/30/2020 Crum Forster Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Advanced Property Preservation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00393

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company

Defendant

Advanced Property Preservation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James J. Hickey

Attorney at Kennedys CMK

100 North Riverside Plaza, Suite 2100

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/30/2020 (Hickey, James) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

#7

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) NOTICE: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 6/2/2020 (kls3) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-393-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 5/22/2020 (kls3) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Hickey on behalf of Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company (Hickey, James) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Advanced Property Preservation, Inc., filed by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hickey, James) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. Responses due by 7/30/2020 (Hickey, James) (Entered: 06/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Staci M. Yandle for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-cv-393-SMY. (tba)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Hickey, James) (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #5 Notice (Other) filed by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. Incorrect event selected. Select the event that most closely matches the document being filed. For this document, the correct event is "Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge" under the heading "Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents." E-filer is instructed to re-file in order to properly file and seal the document. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STRICKEN. NOTICE by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction (Hickey, James) Modified on 5/27/2020 (kls3). (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company was directed to file the attached form regarding consenting or declining to consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction. The time for doing so has now passed, and the Court has not received the form. As required by Administrative Order No. 257, Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company shall return the form within 7 days or face possible sanctions. The Clerk notes that due to the COVID-19 public health crisis, deadlines that were pending on or before April 1, 2020 were extended in accord with Administrative Order No. 261 and/or Amended Administrative Order No. 261. This automated notice does not take into account any such extensions. If, after the expiration of the 7-day deadline set forth herein, the Court chooses to take further action, all applicable deadline extensions will be considered at that time. Consent due by 6/2/2020 (kls3) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 3:20-cv-393-GCS. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 5/22/2020 (kls3) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by James J. Hickey on behalf of Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company (Hickey, James) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Advanced Property Preservation, Inc., filed by Crum & Forster Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hickey, James) (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less