This case was last updated from PACER on 08/13/2019 at 07:35:26 (UTC).

Crowley v. U.S. Social Security Administration, Commissioner

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 Crowley filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against U S Social Security Administration, Commissioner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Hampshire District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph N. Laplante. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00650

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Hampshire District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph N. Laplante

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Carl Crowley

Defendants

U.S. Social Security Administration, Commissioner

US Social Security Administration, Commissioner

Not Classified By Court

US Social Security Admin-Notice Only USA (Court Use Only)

US Social Security Administration - Notice Only (Court Use Only)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ruth Dorothea Heintz

Attorney at NH Legal Assistance (Claremont)

24 Opera House Sq, Ste 206

Claremont, NH 03743-2603

 

Court Documents

2 #1

Motion with Plaintiff's Signature

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summonses issued electronically as to U.S. Social Security Administration, Commissioner. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Notice ECF, #2 Notice ECF SSA- Immigration Cases) (ej) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ENDORSED ORDER granting: #2 Motion to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs. Text of Order: Plaintiff's request to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs is hereby granted, but only for the purpose of waiving the filing fee. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Lynch. (ej) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click #HERE. (ej) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Joseph N. Laplante. The case designation is: 1:19-cv-650-JL. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ej) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs filed by Carl Crowley. Follow up on Objection on 6/28/2019. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Heintz, Ruth) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/19/2019: #1 Motion with Plaintiff's Signature) (ej). (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NEW CASE/SSA COMPLAINT (No fee paid, USA or IFP) filed by Carl Crowley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons - Waiver, #3 Summons - Waiver, #4 Summons - Waiver)(Heintz, Ruth) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less